Gold Crest, LLC v. Project Light, LLC
Plaintiff: Gold Crest, LLC
Defendant: Project Light, LLC and Does 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv06982
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON PARTIES STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO THE COURT TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPOND TO OCTOBER 16, 2019 #12 by Judge R. Gary Klausner (lc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 Corrected STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Project Light, LLC answer now due 10/16/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Crest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trope, Konrad)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Project Light, LLC answer now due 10/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Crest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trope, Konrad)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gold Crest, LLC, upon Defendant Project Light, LLC served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lorraine Plotrowaki, Authorized Representative/Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Trope, Konrad)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Project Light, LLC. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gold Crest, LLC, (Trope, Konrad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Gold Crest, LLC. (Trope, Konrad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Gold Crest, LLC. (Trope, Konrad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gold Crest, LLC. (Trope, Konrad)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24245400 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gold Crest, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2) (Attorney Konrad Lytell Trope added to party Gold Crest, LLC(pty:pla))(Trope, Konrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Crest, LLC v. Project Light, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Project Light, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Crest, LLC
Represented By: Konrad Lytell Trope
Represented By: Kyriacos S Tsircou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?