Kalyd Odeh v. Chanel, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kalyd Odeh
Defendant: Chanel, Inc. and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv07004
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2020 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/25/2020 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on September 23, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: March 30, 2020. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: April 3, 2020. (iv)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUEST: ADR PROCEDURE SELECTION #16 by Judge John F. Walter. DENIED by Order of the Court. (iv)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: Labor and Employment. Filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc.(Crisp, Caitlyn)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc... (Crisp, Caitlyn)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Yolanda A Slaughter Re ECF User filed by Plaintiff Kalyd Odeh. (Slaughter, Yolanda)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kalyd Odeh, identifying Plaintiff Kalyd Odeh. (Slaughter, Yolanda)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Holger Besch re Lead Counsel in Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc.. (Besch, Holger)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. section 1446(d) filed by defendant Chanel, Inc.. (Crisp, Caitlyn)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for September 23, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before September 6, 2019. (iv)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
August 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
August 12, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Chanel, Inc., Does 1 through 25, Inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Kalyd Odeh.(CONFORMED FILED COPY OF 5/6/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc. (Crisp, Caitlyn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc., identifying 1. Chanel, Inc. - Defendant 2. Chanel S.A. - Parent of Defendant 3. Kalyd Odeh - Plaintiff. (Crisp, Caitlyn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Catherine Koenig re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc.. (Crisp, Caitlyn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Holger G. Besch re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc.. (Crisp, Caitlyn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc.. (Crisp, Caitlyn)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV7004 Receipt No: 0973-24248758 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Chanel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Caitlyn M Crisp added to party Chanel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Crisp, Caitlyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalyd Odeh v. Chanel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel, Inc.
Represented By: Caitlyn M Crisp
Represented By: Holger G Besch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalyd Odeh
Represented By: Yolanda A Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?