The Wonderful Company LLC et al v. Corey Angelo et al
Plaintiff: Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC, The Wonderful Company LLC and Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC
Defendant: COREY ANGELO, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Wanderfuel, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07007
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiffs The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. upon Wanderfuel, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Corey Angelo. (Vasseghi, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #11 as to Defendant Wanderfuel, Inc. (iv)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by plaintiffs The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. (Vasseghi, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Wanderfuel, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiffs The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC(Vasseghi, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Michael M. Vasseghi RE: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. (Vasseghi, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Corey Angelo. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Vasseghi, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Vasseghi, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC, identifying WPA Holdings LLC; Stewart & Lynda Resnick Revocable Living Trust (1988) Trust. (Vasseghi, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Vasseghi, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24249036 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff The Wonderful Company LLC, Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC. (Attorney Michael M Vasseghi added to party The Wonderful Company LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael M Vasseghi added to party Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC(pty:pla))(Vasseghi, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Wonderful Company LLC et al v. Corey Angelo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COREY ANGELO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanderfuel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wonderful Pistachios & Almonds LLC
Represented By: Michael M Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wonderful Company LLC
Represented By: Michael M Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC
Represented By: Michael M Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?