Creative Impact Inc. et al v. MGA Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Zuru, LLC and Creative Impact Inc.
Defendant: MGA Entertainment, Inc. and DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv07009
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 OBJECTIONS to MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, #27 Declarations of Anna Mowbray and Kristin Holland filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson, Benjamin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's state law claims under California's anti-SLAPP law (CCP 425.16) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Johnson, Benjamin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's state law claims under California's anti-SLAPP law (CCP 425.16) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #21 filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson, Benjamin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Johnson, Benjamin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's state law claims under California's anti-SLAPP law (CCP 425.16) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #21 filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anna Mowbray, #2 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #3 Declaration of Kristin L. Holland, #4 Exhibit 2 - Emails, #5 Exhibit 3 - Email, #6 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Anna Mowbray)(Holland, Kristin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 OBJECTIONS to Request for Judicial Notice, #22 filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Holland, Kristin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Holland, Kristin)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. (mku)
September 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc., (Johnson, Benjamin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's state law claims under California's anti-SLAPP law (CCP 425.16) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #21 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JMarrow re Judicial Notice)(Johnson, Benjamin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's state law claims under California's anti-SLAPP law (CCP 425.16) Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Benjamin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Benjamin)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MGA Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 9/20/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc..(Attorney Benjamin C Johnson added to party MGA Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft))(Johnson, Benjamin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer Marrow, Litigation Attorney on behalf of Isaac Larian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Holland, Kristin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC, upon Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Holland, Kristin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 [Service Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) filed as] PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC, served on 8/20/2019. (Holland, Kristin) Modified on 8/26/2019 (es).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge John F. Walter. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to Judge Andrew J. Guilford for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-07009 AG(ASx). (rn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC, upon Resident Agent MGA Entertainment, Inc. served on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jennifer Marrow, Attorney in Legal Department in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Holland, Kristin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Michael J. Duvall of Lead Trial Counsel Re: Compliance with Local Rules Governing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Duvall, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Holland, Kristin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Holland, Kristin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Holland, Kristin)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC, identifying Zuru Inc.. (Attorney Kristin L Holland added to party Zuru, LLC(pty:pla))(Holland, Kristin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Holland, Kristin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Creative Impact Inc., Zuru, LLC. (Holland, Kristin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24249653 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Creative Impact Inc.. (Attorney Kristin L Holland added to party Creative Impact Inc.(pty:pla))(Holland, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creative Impact Inc. et al v. MGA Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zuru, LLC
Represented By: Kristin L Holland
Represented By: Michael J Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Creative Impact Inc.
Represented By: Kristin L Holland
Represented By: Michael J Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGA Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin C Johnson
Represented By: Jennifer A Marrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?