Brian Whitaker v. SV Investment Group Partners, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Farhad Yaghoubi, SV Investment Group Partners, LLC and Elham Yaghoubi
Case Number: 2:2019cv07013
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #18 as to Defendant Elham Yaghoubi. (lom)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #18 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Seabock, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Farhad Yaghoubi, Elham Yaghoubi amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker(Seabock, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Christopher A. Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Christopher A Seabock added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Seabock, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 10/21/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Farhad Yaghoubi.(mrgo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Farhad Yaghoubi served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John (Doe)-Person apparently in charge at time of service. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to SV Investment Group Partners, LLC answer now due 10/4/2019, filed by defendant SV Investment Group Partners, LLC.(Attorney David Anthony Bernardoni added to party SV Investment Group Partners, LLC(pty:dft))(Bernardoni, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 08/28/19. (Carson, Chris)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant SV Investment Group Partners, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: C T Corporation - Brianna Sanchez (intake specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (tj)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07013 SVW(JEMx). (rn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants SV Investment Group Partners, LLC, Farhad Yaghoubi. (ghap)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24249964 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. SV Investment Group Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farhad Yaghoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SV Investment Group Partners, LLC
Represented By: David Anthony Bernardoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elham Yaghoubi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Christopher A Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?