In re Robert W. Hunt, M.D., A Medical Corporation
Appellee: Peter C. Anderson and David M Goodrich
Not Yet Classified: Robert W. Hunt M.D. a Medical Corporation
Appellant: Carmen Popovich, Gaston Popovich, Miguel Popovich and Peli Popovich Hunt
Case Number: 2:2019cv07027
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 APPELLANTS OPENING BRIEF filed by Appellant Peli Popovich Hunt. (twdb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 APPENDIX FRBP 8009(d) filed by Appellant Peli Popovich Hunt. (twdb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 10/3/2019. (twdb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability, Certificate of Readiness re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #1 (twdb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Appellants Peli Popovich Hunt, Carmen Popovich, Gaston Popovich, Miguel Popovich. (twdb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (esa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 8/12/19. (esa)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION Re: ORDER approving Application of The Chapter 7 Trustee to employ Counsel Weiland Golden Goodrich pursuant to 11 USC 327 and 330 entered on 7/30/19 by Bankruptcy Judge Ernest M. Robles, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 8/8/19. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:11-bk-58228 ER, Adversary number: NA, BAP case number: NA., filed by appellants Miguel Popovich, Peli Popovich Hunt, Gaston Popovich, Carmen Popovich. (Attachments: #1 BK Dkt) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Robert W. Hunt, M.D., A Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Peter C. Anderson
Represented By: Hatty Yip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David M Goodrich
Represented By: David Gould
Represented By: Reem J Bello
Represented By: Beth E Gaschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Robert W. Hunt M.D. a Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carmen Popovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gaston Popovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Miguel Popovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Peli Popovich Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?