Charles Grommes La Roche v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Charles Grommes La Roche
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv07033
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/29/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily something?. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified mail receipts)(Gilinger, Lisa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-7033 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Order Re Procedures in Social Security Appeal by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (nbo)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Granting #5 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (nbo)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form #6 filed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Please put for the Central District of California. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche, identifying none. (Gilinger, Lisa)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Charles Grommes La Roche. (Attorney Lisa C Gilinger added to party Charles Grommes La Roche(pty:pla))(Gilinger, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles Grommes La Roche v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Grommes La Roche
Represented By: Lisa C Gilinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?