Maka Hospice, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar, II
Plaintiff: Maka Hospice, Inc.
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II and Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv07065
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 STATEMENT (Defendant's) Statement Regarding Order For Plaintiff to Show Cause RE: Dismissal for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar, II re: Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #10 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beck, Daniel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Beck counsel for Plaintiff Maka Hospice, Inc.. Adding Daniel A. Beck as counsel of record for Alez M. Azar II for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar II. (Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Maka Hospice, Inc.(pty:pla))(Beck, Daniel)
August 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Maka Hospice, Inc.to Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #10 (Brownstein, William)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #6 ; AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court DENIES Maka Hospices Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Additionally, Maka Hospice is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, on or before August 26, 2019, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (lc). Modified on 8/19/2019 (lc).
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Maka Hospice, Inc., upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Brownstein, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. (shb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Maka Hospice, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Compelling Payment of Funds Withheld by Defendant and for An Order Compelling Defendant to Immediately Pay for All Services Performed by Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff Maka Hospice, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Maka Hospice, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Maka Hospice, Inc.. (Brownstein, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24257178 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Maka Hospice, Inc.. (Attorney William H Brownstein added to party Maka Hospice, Inc.(pty:pla))(Brownstein, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maka Hospice, Inc. v. Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maka Hospice, Inc.
Represented By: William H Brownstein
Represented By: Abundio Delicona Marapao, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?