Carlos Rodriguez Olivera v. Gregory Archambeault
Petitioner: Carlos Rodriguez-Olivera
Respondent: Gregory Archambeault
Case Number: 2:2019cv07081
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. #1 CV38) (jtil).
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred to District of Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Western Division*.*225 East Temple Street, Room 181**Los Angeles, CA 90012-3332*. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 transfer order) (jpp)(sjt). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Carlos Rodriguez-Olivera. (Bakeman, Willard) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gregory Archambeault. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bettwy, Samuel)(jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion to set briefing schedule. Respondent shall file a response to Petitioners Motion on or before 7/19/2019, and Petitioner may file a reply, if any, on or before 7/26/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/16/2019. (jpp) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION Set Briefing Schedule Dates by Gregory Archambeault. (Bettwy, Samuel)Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Gregory Archambeault(pty:res) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Petitioner's Motion for Emergency Stay.Within seven (7) days of being served with the Petition (ECF No. 1) and Motion, Respondent Gregory Archambeault SHALL FILE an opposition to the Motion. Petitioner MAY FILE a reply, if any, within seven (7) days of being served with Respondents opposition. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 07/08/2019.(mme) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Carlos Rodriguez-Olivera. (Bakeman, Willard) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Gregory Archambeault, filed by Carlos Rodriguez-Olivera.(Filing fee $5 - receipt number: 0974-12691529) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1241-JLS-AGS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Bakeman, Willard)(jms) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlos Rodriguez Olivera v. Gregory Archambeault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Rodriguez-Olivera
Represented By: Willard Patrick Bakeman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?