Jared Ryan Milgrim v. Elain Levy et al
Plaintiff: Jared Ryan Milgrim
Defendant: Elain Levy, Olive View - UCLA Medical Center Foundation, Inc., Enosh Moriah, Dr. James Quines, Officer Garcia, Dr. Kiran Kamat, Los Angeles Police Department, DOES 20 to 30, DOES 1 to 9, DOES 31 to 40, DOES 10 to 19, Dignity Health (for Northridge Hospital Medical Center), Does 20 to 30, inclusive, Does 31 to 40, inclusive, Does 10 to 19, inclusive, Dignity Health and Does 1 to 9, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv07087
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER DOC. NO. #30 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Court finds that Plaintiff has not established any of conditions necessary togrant a temporary restraining order, preliminary injunction, or permanent injunction. Plaintiff's application provides few facts and, to the extent it addresses the Wintersfactors, offers only legal conclusions. Accordingly, the Application is DENIED, without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a properly noticed Motion requesting relief. (lom)
October 8, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Upon further review, a determination has been made that this case was incorrectly assigned. Pursuant to General Order 05-07, this case is appropriate for the issuance of a report and recommendation by a UnitedStates Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, all future filings should be directed to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for review. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07087 VAP(AS). (rn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 33 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants James Quines, Olive View - UCLA Medical Center Foundation, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim. (hr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 EX PARTE COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction, Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order ; Declarations In Support Thereof filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bm)
October 7, 2019 Filing 29 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Kiran Kamat.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Schedule of Pre-trial and trial dates)(Pluma, Gillian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants James Quines, Olive View - UCLA Medical Center Foundation, Inc. #26 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proofs of service attached to the Application are not legible, and plaintiff must file Proofs of Service of the latest Amended Pleadings for both parties (Third Amended Complaint indicated) that are being moved against for default. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (bm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Contact Information as to Defendant Enosh Moriah filed by Defendants Garcia, Los Angeles Police Department. (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
September 16, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Garcia.(Attorney Hasmik Jasmine Badalian Collins added to party Garcia(pty:dft))(Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendants Dr. James Quines, an individual, Olive View - UCLA Medical Center Foundation, Inc., a California Non-Profit Corporation filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim, re REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel #24 served on 9/13/19. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim, re NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO ADVERSE PARTY #22 served on 9/13/19. (bm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO ADVERSE PARTY RE: REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1446(b) and 28 U.S.C. 1446(c); Declaration Of Jared Milgrim And Supporting Exhibits filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(bm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS #19 RE: Notice of Change of Attorney, Business or Contact #18 by Clerk of Court. the document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by September 17, 2019. (bm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Pro se defendant must file and sign a Notice of Change of Address. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 9/12/19. NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Hasmik Jasmine Badalian Collins counsel for Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. Filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine) Modified on 9/12/2019 (bm).
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gillian N Pluma counsel for Defendant Kiran Kamat. Adding Gillian N. Pluma, Esq. as counsel of record for Kiran Kamat, M.D. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kiran Kamat, M.D.. (Pluma, Gillian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Conformed Copy of Answer Filed In State Court Defendant Kiran Kamat, M.D. Kiran Kamat.(Attorney Gillian N Pluma added to party Kiran Kamat(pty:dft))(Pluma, Gillian)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department.(Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department, re Notice (Other), #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Joinder (non-motion), #6 , Joinder (non-motion), #7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Joinder (non-motion), #9 , Notice (Other), #3 , Joinder (non-motion), #8 served on August 16, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Part Two of Four, #2 Part Three of Four, #3 Part Four of Four)(Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim, upon Defendant Garcia served on 7/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Viramontes, Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed in state court 8/2/19, submitted as document 3, attachment 1, p. 280) (esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim, upon Defendant Los Angeles Police Department served on 7/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Julie Amante, Deputy Clerk, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed ins state court 8/2/19, submitted as document 3, attachment 1, p. 276) (esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Elain Levy, et al, filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim (Filed in state court 7/5/19, submitted as document 3, attachment 1, p. 198)(esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint filed by defendant Dr. Kiran Kamat. (Filed in state court 6/7/29, submitted as document 3, attachment 1, p. 177)(esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint filed by defendant Dignity Health (Filed in state court 6/3/19, submitted as document 3, attachment 1, p. 168)(esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Elain Levy, et al, filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim (Filed in state court 12/19/18, submitted as document 2, p. 435)(esa)
August 14, 2019 COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Dignity Health, et al, filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim (non-conformed, submitted as document 2, p. 182)(esa)
August 14, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Dignity Health, et al, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Jared Ryan Milgrim. (Filed in state court 10/13/17, submitted as document 2, p. 14) (esa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 JOINDER filed by Defendant Dignity Health (for Northridge Hospital Medical Center) joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice (Other), #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Joinder (non-motion), #6 , Notice (Other), #3 , Joinder (non-motion), #8 , Joinder (non-motion), #7 . (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 JOINDER filed by Defendant Dr. Kiran Kamat joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice (Other), #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Joinder (non-motion), #6 , Notice (Other), #3 , Joinder (non-motion), #7 . (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 JOINDER filed by Defendant Enosh Moriah joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice (Other), #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Joinder (non-motion), #6 , Notice (Other), #3 . (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 JOINDER filed by Defendant Elain Levy joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Notice (Other), #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #5 , Notice (Other), #3 . (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department, (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Defendant Los Angeles Police Department's Compendium of State Court Exhibits in Support of Notice of Removal [ Part Two of Two, Exhibits 68 thru 134] filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 86 thru 134)(Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Defendant Los Angeles Police Department's Compendium of State Court Exhibits in Support of Notice of Removal [ Part One of Two, Exhibits 1 thru 67] filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. (Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC679626 Receipt No: 0973-24263020 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Hasmik Jasmine Badalian Collins added to party Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft))(Badalian Collins, Hasmik Jasmine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jared Ryan Milgrim v. Elain Levy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elain Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive View - UCLA Medical Center Foundation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enosh Moriah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. James Quines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Garcia
Represented By: Hasmik Jasmine Badalian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kiran Kamat
Represented By: David Jay Ozeran
Represented By: Christopher P Wend
Represented By: Gillian N Pluma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Police Department
Represented By: Hasmik Jasmine Badalian Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 20 to 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 31 to 40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 10 to 19
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health (for Northridge Hospital Medical Center)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 20 to 30, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 31 to 40, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 10 to 19, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Represented By: Gregory G Lynch
Represented By: Nicholas Tasso Koumoulis
Represented By: Jason R Chermela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 9, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Ryan Milgrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?