Koi Design LLC v. A. Douglas Mastroianni et al
Plaintiff: Koi Design, LLC
Defendant: Bloom Firm, APC, Marron Lawyers, APC, A. Douglas Mastroianni, Does 1 through 25 and The Bloom Firm, APC
Trustee: United States Trustee LA
Not Yet Classified: Koi Design LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07154
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING, #24 . It is Ordered that the motion to withdraw the reference be, and hereby is, Granted. (shb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents - select - For Judicial Notice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING filed by Defendant Marron Lawyers, APC In Support of re: Declaration #23 , Reply, #22 (Miller, Randall)
August 30, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Zachary Mayer re Reply, #22 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ZACHARY MAYER IN SUPPORT OF MARRON LAWYERS, APCS MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING filed by Defendant Marron Lawyers, APC. (Miller, Randall)
August 30, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY filed by Defendant Marron Lawyers, APC to Answer to Complaint #17 , Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 DEFENDANT MARRON LAWYERS, APCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING (Miller, Randall)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Miscellaneous Documents (Other Filings) - select - Objection and Link to the Motion to Withdraw Reference. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambersstaff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B.Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall immediately serve the complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 onall parties, including this Order on any new parties to the action and file the proofs of service pursuant to Local Rule 5-3.1 with the Court. See order for details. (shb)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-cv-00236 TJH(GJSx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07154 TJH. Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by In re Debtor Koi Design LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Rozansky, Nicholas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Koi Design LLC.(Attorney Nicholas A Rozansky added to party Koi Design LLC(pty:db))(Rozansky, Nicholas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE filed by Defendant The Bloom Firm, APC. of Joinder to Defendant Marron Laywers, APC's Motion to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John T. A. Rosenthal, Esq. in Support of Joinder of the Bloom Firm, APC, to Defendant Marron Laywers, APC's Motion to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Rosenthal, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Marron Lawyers, APC. correcting Miscellaneous Document, #6 , Declaration #4 , Notice of Related Case(s) #5 , Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 Including (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AMENDED CERTIFICATES OF SERVICE)(Miller, Randall)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Text Only Notice (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 13 . Document # 13 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk enter the Notice of Hearing twice in error. (ghap)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Withdrawl Reference by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is set for hearing. Hearing regarding Motion to Withdraw Reference (Complaint) set for 9/16/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Withdrawl Reference by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is set for hearing. Hearing regarding Motion to Withdraw Reference (Complaint) set for 9/16/2019 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Bankruptcy Matter Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 to District Judge Cormac J. Carney. Proposed order forwarded to District Judge. (ghap)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and Chapter 11 Debtor and Debtor in Possession Koi Design, LLC, re Objection #7 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #8 served on 8/19/2019. (Seflin, Susan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Susan K Seflin counsel for Debtor-in-Possession Koi Design, LLC. Adding Susan K. Seflin as counsel of record for Koi Design LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff and Chapter 11 Debtor and Debtor in Possession Koi Design LLC. (Attorney Susan K Seflin added to party Koi Design, LLC(pty:db_pos))(Seflin, Susan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #5 Opposition to Defendant Marron Lawyer APC's Notice of Related Case filed by Debtor-in-Possession Koi Design, LLC. (Seflin, Susan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING filed by Defendant Marron Lawyers, APC In Support of re: Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Miller, Randall)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Marron Lawyers, APC. Related Case(s): 2:19-bk-10762-NB and 2:19-ap-01197-NB (Miller, Randall)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Zachary Mayer re Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 In Support of Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy filed by Defendant Marron Lawyers, APC. (Miller, Randall)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Marron Lawyers, APC. (Miller, Randall)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marron Lawyers, APC, identifying Koi Design LLC, A. Douglas Mastroianni, Marron Lawyers, APC, The Bloom Firm, APC. (Miller, Randall)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding No. 2:19-ap-01197-NB to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Case No. 2:19-bk-10762-NB Receipt No: 0973-24277215 - Fee: $181, filed by Defendants Marron Lawyers, APC. (Attorney Randall Allen Miller added to party Marron Lawyers, APC(pty:dft))(Miller, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koi Design LLC v. A. Douglas Mastroianni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee LA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloom Firm, APC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marron Lawyers, APC
Represented By: Randall Allen Miller
Represented By: Zachary Mayer
Represented By: John W Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Douglas Mastroianni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bloom Firm, APC
Represented By: John T. A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Heather Rosing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koi Design, LLC
Represented By: Jason B Komorsky
Represented By: Nicholas A Rozansky
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Bagdanov
Represented By: Susan K Seflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Koi Design LLC
Represented By: Nicholas A Rozansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?