Steven Fishman v. William Barr
Plaintiff: Steven Fishman
Defendant: William P Barr
Respondent: William P Barr United States Attorney General, Custodian of the Petitioner, a/k/a -- d/b/a Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 2:2019cv07202
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 23 OPPOSITION to Petitioner's Objection to Transfer [Dkt. 8] and Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order [Dkt. 12] filed by Respondent William P Barr. (Chao, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of Assistant United States Attorney David H. Chao on behalf of Respondent William P Barr. Assistant United States Attorney Daniel Nowicki terminated. (Attorney David H Chao added to party William P Barr(pty:res))(Chao, David)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSTRUING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO BE REPLY TO RETURN TO PETITION AND ALTERNATIVELY DENYING MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DOCKET NO. #16 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Motion is denied without prejudice at this juncture because any relief to which petitioner may or may not be entitled will be determined at a later juncture in connection with the Court's assessment of the Petition, the Return, the Reply and any other pertinent documents which may appropriately be considered. (See document for details.) (sbou)
September 30, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (jm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 Petitioner's verified statement of jurisdictional facts, filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (jm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 Demand for mandatory judicial notice pursuant to Federal Rule of evidence 201(c)(2), filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (jm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 Demand for mandatory judicial notice pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 201(c)(2), filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (jm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (jm)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITIONERS OBJECTION/MOTION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Respondent shall file a response to such Objection and Motion within thirty (30) days. Petitioner may file any reply thereto within fourteen (14) days of the filing of respondents response. (See document for further details) (vm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF:(FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 60(b) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT OR ORDER; AND FEDERAL RULE. OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. 59(e) MOTION TO ALTER AND/OR AMEND JUDGMENT; AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 52(b) MOTION TO AMEND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by Plaintiff Steven Fishman. (sbou)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (sbou)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING OF: FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 60(b) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT OR ORDER; AND FEDERAL RULE. OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. 59(e) MOTION TO ALTER AND/OR AMEND JUDGMENT; AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 52(b) MOTION TO AMEND FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (sbou)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #1 Response to Petition filed by Respondent William P Barr. (Attachments: #1 Complete Petition in Order)(Nowicki, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (sbou)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (sbou)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION to Order on Application to Transfer Case, #2 filed by Petitioner Steven Fishman. (sbou)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney Daniel Nowicki on behalf of Respondent William P Barr. (Attorney Daniel Nowicki added to party William P Barr(pty:res))(Nowicki, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: that Respondent William P Barr file Answer to the Petition not later than 9/14/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 9/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Pt 1, #2 Habeas Pt 2, #3 Habeas Pt 3, #4 Habeas Pt 4) (sbou)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING REQUIREMENTS FOR PREPARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. All future documents submitted in this case should be addressed to: "Clerk, U.S. District Court, Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, CA 90012-1565." (See document for further details.) (sbou)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV38) (jtil)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia
August 19, 2019 Case transferred to the USDC for the Central District of California, pursuant to the Court Order entered 7/29/2019. Sent to Court via extraction. (tth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring case. See Order for details. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner at the address listed on the docket. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/29/2019. (lctjk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616099540) filed by STEVEN FISHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1 of 2, #2 Appendix Part 2 of 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tth). (Some pages out of order; document scanned in order it was received.) Modified on 7/16/2019 to add receipt number (tth). Modified text on 7/17/2019 (tth). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Fishman v. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr United States Attorney General, Custodian of the Petitioner, a/k/a -- d/b/a Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: David H Chao
Represented By: Daniel Nowicki
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?