Los Angeles Waterkeeper v. Commercial Sandblast Company
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Waterkeeper
Defendant: Commercial Sandblast and Commercial Sandblast Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv07213
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Commercial Sandblast Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper(Orion, Brian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brian Orion on behalf of Plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper (Attorney Brian Orion added to party Los Angeles Waterkeeper(pty:pla))(Orion, Brian)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07213 MWF(JEMx). (rn)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Document #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (CV-30 form) filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper (Sproul, Christopher)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Los Angeles Waterkeeper. (Sproul, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24289713 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Waterkeeper. (Attorney Christopher A Sproul added to party Los Angeles Waterkeeper(pty:bkmov))(Sproul, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Los Angeles Waterkeeper v. Commercial Sandblast Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Sandblast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Sandblast Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Waterkeeper
Represented By: Christopher A Sproul
Represented By: Fredric Alan Evenson
Represented By: Brian Orion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?