Melvin Joseph Simmons v. Marion E. Spearman et al
Petitioner: Melvin Joseph Simmons
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of California, Ralph Diaz, John or Jane Doe, Director of California Department of Corrections and Marion E Spearman
Case Number: 2:2019cv07247
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV 111, #2 CV 38) (esa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to the Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *Central District of California, Western Division*.*312 North Spring Street, Room G-8**Los Angeles, CA 90012-4701*. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Rejecting Document: Request to Deposit Interpleader Certificate of Acknowledgement, from Petitioner Melvin Joseph Simmons. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Petitioner seeks to file a "request to deposit interpleader certification", which apparently a value from which the $5.00 filing fee can be paid. There are two ways for this case to proceed. First, Petitioner may pay the $5.00 filing fee, or second, Petitioner may move to proceed in forma pauperis. The "request to deposit" constitutes neither and thus the Court will not accept the document. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/15/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jah). [Transferred from California Southern on 8/21/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Ralph Diaz, Director of California Department of Corrections, John or Jane Doe, Marion E. Spearman, The Attorney General of the State of California, filed by Melvin Joseph Simmons. ($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1518-BAS-LL. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(tcf) [Transferred from California Southern on 8/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melvin Joseph Simmons v. Marion E. Spearman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marion E Spearman
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin Joseph Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?