Kari J. Smith v. Batterson et al

Plaintiff: Kari J. Smith
Defendant: Santa Barbara County Jail, Crystal Batterson, Shur and Sgt Carnett
Case Number: 2:2019cv07259
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
August 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Kari J. Smith. (Plummer, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/21/19 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California. (Plummer, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
August 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Kari J. Smith. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
August 14, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE: After initial screening this case is re-designated as Prisoner Civil Rights action pursuant to chambers request. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kari J. Smith. (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/22/2019.] Modified on 8/22/2019 (lh).
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kari J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (York, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kari J. Smith v. Batterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Barbara County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Batterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Carnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kari J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?