William Hauser v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Plaintiff: William Hauser
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, Hyundai Mobis Co Ltd, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, Hyundai Motor Group, TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC, Hyundai Motor Company, -, ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp and Hyundai Motor America Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv07292
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court orders this case to be transferred to MDL No. 2905: In Re: ZF-TRW Airbag Control Units Products Liability Litigation. Counsel shall refrain from filing any further pleadings or documents in this case as of the date of this Order. All documents shall be filed in MDL No. 2905. Counsel shall refer to the docket of MDL. No. 2905 to obtain the Order with respect to how all documents are to be filed. The Clerk is directed to close this case and transfer the names of all parties and their respective counsel to MDL No. 2905. (cbr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC answer now due 9/27/2019; ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp answer now due 9/27/2019; TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc answer now due 9/27/2019; TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC answer now due 9/27/2019, filed by Defendants TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC; ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp; TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc; TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC.(Tsoumas, Tammy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp identifying ZF Friedrichshafen AG as Corporate Parent. (Tsoumas, Tammy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas counsel for Defendants TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp. Adding Tammy A. Tsoumas as counsel of record for ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ZF-TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.. (Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Tammy Ann Tsoumas added to party ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp(pty:dft))(Tsoumas, Tammy)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mark C Holscher counsel for Defendants TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC, TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp. Adding Mark C. Holscher as counsel of record for ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., TRW Automotive Inc., TRW Automotive U.S. LLC, and TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc.. (Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mark C Holscher added to party ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp(pty:dft))(Holscher, Mark)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (et)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Alabama Northern
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 1 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 8/21/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:19-cv-01194-JEO from USDC Northern District of Alabama (Southern). Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:19-ml-02905-JAK (FFMx). (et)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of California Central for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically submitted to Clerk of Court in District of California Central. (KEK) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/26/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Hauser. TRW Automotive Inc served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; TRW Automotive US LLC served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; ZF Friedrichshafen AG served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/26/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor America Inc, TRW Automotive Inc, TRW Automotive US LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp. mailed certified mail (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/26/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3401990, NDAL receipt #B4601099507. (Tapley, Frank) Modified on 8/1/2019 (JLC). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/26/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by William Hauser. (KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/26/2019.]
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Mobis Co Ltd, Hyundai Motor America Inc, Hyundai Motor Company, Hyundai Motor Group, TRW Automotive Inc, TRW Automotive US LLC, TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc, ZF Friedrichshafen AG, ZF TRW Automotive Holldngs Corp, filed by William Hauser.(KAM) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 8/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William Hauser v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF Friedrichshafen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Mobis Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW AUTOMOTIVE INC
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor Company, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp
Represented By: Tammy Ann Tsoumas
Represented By: Mark C Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hauser
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: Jonathan S Mann
Represented By: Lauren Sanderson Miller
Represented By: Christopher T Hellums
Represented By: Hirlye R Lutz, III
Represented By: Adam W Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?