Vincent Mlodinoff v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Mlodinoff
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company and Does 1-30
Case Number: 2:2019cv07296
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby VACATES the hearing. Jury Trial is set for 11/10/2020 at 9:00 AM; the Final Pretrial Conference/Motions in Limine hearing is set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for other deadlines and requirements.* (cw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company.. (Michail, Maureen)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07296 FMO(SSx). (rn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (car)
August 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company. Filed in State Court on 8/21/19 Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
August 22, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 30, USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by plaintiff Vincent Mlodinoff. Filed in State Court on 7/25/19 Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company, (Michail, Maureen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company. (Michail, Maureen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2019-00531092-CU-BC-VTA Receipt No: 0973-24308572 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court) (Attorney Maureen M Michail added to party USAA General Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(Michail, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent Mlodinoff v. USAA General Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Mlodinoff
Represented By: Vernon Charles Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Maureen M Michail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?