Leo J. Gelfo v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Leo J Gelfo
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv07327
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Leo J Gelfo, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 8/29/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Front desk/Reception. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to E. Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to R. Oliver. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 summons executed with proof of service)(Ortega, Omar)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ec)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (esa) Modified on 8/23/2019 (esa).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Leo J Gelfo, (Ortega, Omar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Leo J Gelfo. (Ortega, Omar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Leo J Gelfo. (Ortega, Omar)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24313203 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Leo J Gelfo. (Attorney Omar Ortega added to party Leo J Gelfo(pty:pla))(Ortega, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leo J. Gelfo v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo J Gelfo
Represented By: Omar Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?