Luzette Romprey v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Luzette M. Romprey
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv07340
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-7340 RAO on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Patrick W Snyder added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Snyder, Patrick)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Luzette M. Romprey. (Leland, Judith)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Luzette M. Romprey, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Leland, Judith)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. See Order for details. (dml)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (lh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Luzette M. Romprey. (Leland, Judith)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Luzette M. Romprey. (Leland, Judith)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Luzette M. Romprey, identifying Luzette M. Romprey. (Leland, Judith)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24316077 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Luzette M. Romprey. (Attorney Judith S Leland added to party Luzette M. Romprey(pty:pla))(Leland, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luzette Romprey v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luzette M. Romprey
Represented By: Enrique M Juarez
Represented By: Judith S Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?