Andre Israel Kotcharian v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andre Israel Kotcharian
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv07344
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:19-cv-07344-SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Andre Israel Kotcharian. (Barasch, Stuart)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andre Israel Kotcharian, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/30/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to G. Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie L. Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Barasch, Stuart)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (clee)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (hr)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andre Israel Kotcharian. (Barasch, Stuart)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andre Israel Kotcharian, (Barasch, Stuart)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Andre Israel Kotcharian. (Barasch, Stuart)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Andre Israel Kotcharian. (Barasch, Stuart)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Andre Israel Kotcharian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stuart Barasch added to party Andre Israel Kotcharian(pty:pla))(Barasch, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andre Israel Kotcharian v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Amanda Schapel
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Israel Kotcharian
Represented By: Stuart Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?