Taylor Pantel et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Ruggeri, John McLeod, Scott Trump, Andrea Tevini, Craig Sparks, Mathew Storckman, Edward Scott, Fred Ortiz, Amoreena McCoy, Juan Sanchez, Brent Topie, Robert Williams, John White, Michael McCoy, Simon Smith, Bear Scharbarth, Kimberly Terry, Ashley Miller, Charles Young, Catherine Rhode, Nielsen Tauoa, John Wilcox, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Mark Robb, Sahn Sirivong, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryce Monteleone, John Spencer, Mike Miliotti, Julie Vonada, Chris McCoy, Ace McFarlin, Kimberly Topie, Scott Mcanally, Jerry Pettes, Varun Sharma, Janice McWhorter, James Robertson, Nicole Topie, Javier Soto, Eugene Raschke, Denise Peabody, David Oakley, Frank Vonada, Bryan Terry, Robert Topie, Sam Peterson, Rob Sauser, Spencer White, Carey Wishon, Dominic Patino, Janel Young, Andrew Smith, Rick Russell, Edward Schultz, Joe Wehrle, Britney Smith, Linda Meske, Trevor Pierson, John Sujishi, Marv Meske, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Terry Rhode, Dina Ranson, Gerry Trias, Joey Mendoza, Derek Ranson, Carlos Papion, Dale Peabody, Matthew Nattenberg, Alvis McWhorter, Denise Oakley, Taylor Pantel, Chad Smith, Joedy Muha, William Reeder, Janet Smith, Brenda Solties, Robin Raschke, Steven Smith, Billy Perkins, Robert Nichols, Donna Miliotti, Flor Trias, Sam Neer, Amit Sharma, Rick Solties, Lisa Reeder, Dianne Pettes, Kathryn Wilcox and Jennifer Perkins
Defendant: General Motors LLC, Merle Stone Chevrolet, Robert Bosch GmbH, Rally Auto Group, Inc. and Robert Bosch LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07350
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
2 Judge: Rozella A Oliver
3 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #29 ;PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND #28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Transfer Motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan. The Remand Motion remains pending, to be determined by the district court. (iv)
October 7, 2019 Filing 39 MINUTES OF MOTION TO REMAND TO CALIFORNIA STATE COURT #28 MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF MICHIGAN #29 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv)
October 7, 2019 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant General Motors LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Anya Martin at anya.martin@kirkland.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Smith, Renee)
October 4, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan M Sandrock counsel for Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. Adding Ryan Sandrock as counsel of record for Robert Bosch LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. (Attorney Ryan M Sandrock added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Sandrock, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Decision: Notice of Recent Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominic Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice)(Miller, Charles)
September 23, 2019 Filing 35 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan #29 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, 2019-09-04 Email from C. Miller to M. Slater)(Smith, Renee)
September 23, 2019 Filing 34 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #28 filed by Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominic Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young. (Miller, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Filing 33 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #28 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Smith, Renee)
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan #29 filed by Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominic Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young. (Pearson, Eric)
September 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #28 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Miller, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Remand #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. A Word or Wordperfect version of the proposed order should also be emailed to the chambers generic email address. See Local Rule 5-4.4.1- Electronic Lodging of Proposed Orders. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Michigan filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration R. Smith Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, First Amended Complaint in In re Duramax, #3 Exhibit B, Complaint in Abney v. General Motors LLC, #4 Exhibit C, 2019-08-29 Email from E. Pearson, #5 Proposed Order) (Smith, Renee)
September 3, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominic Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young. Motion set for hearing on 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand) (Miller, Charles)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of General Motors LLC, designating Robyn E. Bladow as local counsel #23 . (iv)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Eric D. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of All Plaintiff, designating Edward E. Angwin as local counsel #21 . (iv)
August 29, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
August 29, 2019 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24354006) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR 30-DAY EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT [ #11 #17 ] by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that General Motors LLC's and the other served Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint in this action shall be extended by 30 days until September 30, 2019, or to a date 30 days after the Court rules on Defendant General Motors LLCs anticipated motion to transfer. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric D. Pearson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominic Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24347099) filed by Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominic Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Angwin, Edward)
August 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward Eugene Angwin on behalf of Plaintiffs Amoreena McCoy, Chris McCoy, Michael McCoy, Michael McCoy, Ace McFarlin, John McLeod, Alvis McWhorter, Janice McWhorter, Scott Mcanally, Joey Mendoza, Linda Meske, Marv Meske, Donna Miliotti, Mike Miliotti, Ashley Miller, Bryce Monteleone, Joedy Muha, Matthew Nattenberg, Sam Neer, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Robert Nichols, David Oakley, Denise Oakley, Fred Ortiz, Taylor Pantel, Carlos Papion, Dominic Patino, Dale Peabody, Denise Peabody, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Billy Perkins, Jennifer Perkins, Sam Peterson, Dianne Pettes, Jerry Pettes, Trevor Pierson, Derek Ranson, Dina Ranson, Eugene Raschke, Robin Raschke, Lisa Reeder, William Reeder, Catherine Rhode, Terry Rhode, Mark Robb, James Robertson, Nicole Ruggeri, Rick Russell, Juan Sanchez, Rob Sauser, Bear Scharbarth, Edward Schultz, Edward Scott, Amit Sharma, Varun Sharma, Jason Shehan, Sahn Sirivong, Andrew Smith, Britney Smith, Chad Smith, Glen Smith, Janet Smith, Simon Smith, Steven Smith, Brenda Solties, Rick Solties, Javier Soto, Craig Sparks, John Spencer, Mathew Storckman, John Sujishi, Nielsen Tauoa, Bryan Terry, Kimberly Terry, Andrea Tevini, Brent Topie, Kimberly Topie, Nicole Topie, Robert Topie, Flor Trias, Gerry Trias, Scott Trump, Frank Vonada, Julie Vonada, Joe Wehrle, John White, Spencer White, John Wilcox, Kathryn Wilcox, Robert Williams, Carey Wishon, Charles Young, Janel Young (Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Amoreena McCoy(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Chris McCoy(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Michael McCoy(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Michael McCoy(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Ace McFarlin(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party John McLeod(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Alvis McWhorter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Janice McWhorter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Scott Mcanally(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Joey Mendoza(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Linda Meske(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Marv Meske(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Donna Miliotti(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mike Miliotti(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Ashley Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Bryce Monteleone(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Joedy Muha(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Matthew Nattenberg(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Sam Neer(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Cheri Dickson Nichols(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Robert Nichols(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party David Oakley(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Denise Oakley(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Fred Ortiz(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Taylor Pantel(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Carlos Papion(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dominic Patino(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dale Peabody(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Denise Peabody(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Estella Perez-Ortiz(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Billy Perkins(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jennifer Perkins(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Sam Peterson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dianne Pettes(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jerry Pettes(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Trevor Pierson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Derek Ranson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Dina Ranson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Eugene Raschke(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Robin Raschke(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Lisa Reeder(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party William Reeder(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Catherine Rhode(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Terry Rhode(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mark Robb(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party James Robertson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Nicole Ruggeri(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Rick Russell(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Juan Sanchez(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Rob Sauser(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Bear Scharbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Edward Schultz(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Edward Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Amit Sharma(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Varun Sharma(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Jason Shehan(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Sahn Sirivong(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Andrew Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Britney Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Chad Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Glen Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Janet Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Simon Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Steven Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Brenda Solties(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Rick Solties(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Javier Soto(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Craig Sparks(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party John Spencer(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Mathew Storckman(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party John Sujishi(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Nielsen Tauoa(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Bryan Terry(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Kimberly Terry(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Andrea Tevini(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Brent Topie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Kimberly Topie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Nicole Topie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Robert Topie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Flor Trias(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Gerry Trias(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Scott Trump(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Frank Vonada(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Julie Vonada(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Joe Wehrle(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party John White(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Spencer White(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party John Wilcox(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Kathryn Wilcox(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Robert Williams(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Carey Wishon(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Charles Young(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Eugene Angwin added to party Janel Young(pty:pla))(Angwin, Edward)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #18 , Notice of Appearance #16 , REQUEST for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #11 #17 served on August 28, 2019. (Schwartz, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC, (Schwartz, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST for Joinder in EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #11 filed by Defendant Robert Bosch LLC. (Schwartz, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eric B Schwartz on behalf of Defendant Robert Bosch LLC (Attorney Eric B Schwartz added to party Robert Bosch LLC(pty:dft))(Schwartz, Eric)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-07350 MWF(KSx). (rn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re Notice of Lodging #13 served on 8/26/2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant General Motors LLC on 9/26/2019 re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bladow, Robyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 #11 served on 8/26/2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/30/2019 filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robyn Bladow) (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Renee D. Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jennifer Perkins, Billy Perkins, Robert Williams, Britney Smith, Sam Neer, John Sujishi, Amoreena McCoy, Gerry Trias, Fred Ortiz, Bryce Monteleone, Nielsen Tauoa, Donna Miliotti, Terry Rhode, Varun Sharma, Julie Vonada, Kimberly Terry, Carlos Papion, Sahn Sirivong, Simon Smith, Matthew Nattenberg, Charles Young, Kathryn Wilcox, Alvis McWhorter, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Jerry Pettes, Janice McWhorter, Carey Wishon, Kimberly Topie, Rick Russell, Spencer White, Janel Young, Nicole Topie, Rick Solties, Dale Peabody, Rob Sauser, Dina Ranson, Janet Smith, Andrew Smith, Robin Raschke, Joey Mendoza, Mike Miliotti, Flor Trias, Edward Schultz, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryan Terry, Brenda Solties, Catherine Rhode, John White, Brent Topie, Joedy Muha, Steven Smith, Amit Sharma, Javier Soto, Mathew Storckman, Craig Sparks, Ashley Miller, James Robertson, Taylor Pantel, John Wilcox, Denise Peabody, Scott Trump, Denise Oakley, Dominic Patino, Frank Vonada, Andrea Tevini, Eugene Raschke, Linda Meske, John Spencer, Chad Smith, Juan Sanchez, David Oakley, Edward Scott, Robert Topie, Robert Nichols, William Reeder, Mark Robb, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Marv Meske, Michael McCoy, Joe Wehrle, Scott Mcanally, Dianne Pettes, John McLeod, Bear Scharbarth, Nicole Ruggeri, Ace McFarlin, Derek Ranson, Chris McCoy, Sam Peterson, Trevor Pierson, Lisa Reeder, upon Defendant Merle Stone Chevrolet served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael J. Noland, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/14/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1) (lh)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jennifer Perkins, Billy Perkins, Robert Williams, Britney Smith, Sam Neer, John Sujishi, Amoreena McCoy, Gerry Trias, Fred Ortiz, Bryce Monteleone, Nielsen Tauoa, Donna Miliotti, Terry Rhode, Varun Sharma, Julie Vonada, Kimberly Terry, Carlos Papion, Sahn Sirivong, Simon Smith, Matthew Nattenberg, Charles Young, Kathryn Wilcox, Alvis McWhorter, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Jerry Pettes, Janice McWhorter, Carey Wishon, Kimberly Topie, Rick Russell, Spencer White, Janel Young, Nicole Topie, Rick Solties, Dale Peabody, Rob Sauser, Dina Ranson, Janet Smith, Andrew Smith, Robin Raschke, Joey Mendoza, Mike Miliotti, Flor Trias, Edward Schultz, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryan Terry, Brenda Solties, Catherine Rhode, John White, Brent Topie, Joedy Muha, Steven Smith, Amit Sharma, Javier Soto, Mathew Storckman, Craig Sparks, Ashley Miller, James Robertson, Taylor Pantel, John Wilcox, Denise Peabody, Scott Trump, Denise Oakley, Dominic Patino, Frank Vonada, Andrea Tevini, Eugene Raschke, Linda Meske, John Spencer, Chad Smith, Juan Sanchez, David Oakley, Edward Scott, Robert Topie, Robert Nichols, William Reeder, Mark Robb, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Marv Meske, Michael McCoy, Joe Wehrle, Scott Mcanally, Dianne Pettes, John McLeod, Bear Scharbarth, Nicole Ruggeri, Ace McFarlin, Derek Ranson, Chris McCoy, Sam Peterson, Trevor Pierson, Lisa Reeder, upon Defendant Rally Auto Group, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Teryn B. Clarke, Registered Agent, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/08/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1) (lh)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jennifer Perkins, Billy Perkins, Robert Williams, Britney Smith, Sam Neer, John Sujishi, Amoreena McCoy, Gerry Trias, Fred Ortiz, Bryce Monteleone, Nielsen Tauoa, Donna Miliotti, Terry Rhode, Varun Sharma, Julie Vonada, Kimberly Terry, Carlos Papion, Sahn Sirivong, Simon Smith, Matthew Nattenberg, Charles Young, Kathryn Wilcox, Alvis McWhorter, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Jerry Pettes, Janice McWhorter, Carey Wishon, Kimberly Topie, Rick Russell, Spencer White, Janel Young, Nicole Topie, Rick Solties, Dale Peabody, Rob Sauser, Dina Ranson, Janet Smith, Rally Auto Group, Inc., Andrew Smith, Robin Raschke, Joey Mendoza, Mike Miliotti, Flor Trias, Edward Schultz, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryan Terry, Brenda Solties, Catherine Rhode, John White, Brent Topie, Joedy Muha, Steven Smith, Amit Sharma, Javier Soto, Mathew Storckman, Craig Sparks, Ashley Miller, James Robertson, Taylor Pantel, John Wilcox, Denise Peabody, Scott Trump, Denise Oakley, Dominic Patino, Frank Vonada, Andrea Tevini, Eugene Raschke, Linda Meske, John Spencer, Chad Smith, Juan Sanchez, David Oakley, Edward Scott, Robert Topie, Robert Nichols, William Reeder, Mark Robb, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Marv Meske, Michael McCoy, Joe Wehrle, Scott Mcanally, Dianne Pettes, John McLeod, Bear Scharbarth, Nicole Ruggeri, Ace McFarlin, Derek Ranson, Chris McCoy, Sam Peterson, Trevor Pierson, Lisa Reeder, upon Defendant Robert Bosch GmbH served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/08/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1) (lh)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jennifer Perkins, Billy Perkins, Robert Williams, Britney Smith, Sam Neer, John Sujishi, Amoreena McCoy, Gerry Trias, Fred Ortiz, Bryce Monteleone, Nielsen Tauoa, Donna Miliotti, Terry Rhode, Varun Sharma, Julie Vonada, Kimberly Terry, Carlos Papion, Sahn Sirivong, Simon Smith, Matthew Nattenberg, Charles Young, Kathryn Wilcox, Alvis McWhorter, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Jerry Pettes, Janice McWhorter, Carey Wishon, Kimberly Topie, Rick Russell, Spencer White, Janel Young, Nicole Topie, Rick Solties, Dale Peabody, Rob Sauser, Dina Ranson, Janet Smith, Andrew Smith, Robin Raschke, Joey Mendoza, Mike Miliotti, Flor Trias, Edward Schultz, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryan Terry, Brenda Solties, Catherine Rhode, John White, Brent Topie, Joedy Muha, Steven Smith, Amit Sharma, Javier Soto, Mathew Storckman, Craig Sparks, Ashley Miller, James Robertson, Taylor Pantel, John Wilcox, Denise Peabody, Scott Trump, Denise Oakley, Dominic Patino, Frank Vonada, Andrea Tevini, Eugene Raschke, Linda Meske, John Spencer, Chad Smith, Juan Sanchez, David Oakley, Edward Scott, Robert Topie, Robert Nichols, William Reeder, Mark Robb, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Marv Meske, Michael McCoy, Joe Wehrle, Scott Mcanally, Dianne Pettes, John McLeod, Bear Scharbarth, Nicole Ruggeri, Ace McFarlin, Derek Ranson, Chris McCoy, Sam Peterson, Trevor Pierson, Lisa Reeder, upon Defendant Robert Bosch LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/08/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL,DOCUMENT 1-1) (lh)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Jennifer Perkins, Billy Perkins, Robert Williams, Britney Smith, Sam Neer, John Sujishi, Amoreena McCoy, Gerry Trias, Fred Ortiz, Bryce Monteleone, Nielsen Tauoa, Donna Miliotti, Terry Rhode, Varun Sharma, Julie Vonada, Kimberly Terry, Carlos Papion, Sahn Sirivong, Simon Smith, Matthew Nattenberg, Charles Young, Kathryn Wilcox, Alvis McWhorter, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Jerry Pettes, Janice McWhorter, Carey Wishon, Kimberly Topie, Rick Russell, Spencer White, Janel Young, Nicole Topie, Rick Solties, Dale Peabody, Rob Sauser, Dina Ranson, Janet Smith, Andrew Smith, Robin Raschke, Joey Mendoza, Mike Miliotti, Flor Trias, Edward Schultz, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryan Terry, Brenda Solties, Catherine Rhode, John White, Brent Topie, Joedy Muha, Steven Smith, Amit Sharma, Javier Soto, Mathew Storckman, Craig Sparks, Ashley Miller, James Robertson, Taylor Pantel, John Wilcox, Denise Peabody, Scott Trump, Denise Oakley, Dominic Patino, Frank Vonada, Andrea Tevini, Eugene Raschke, Linda Meske, John Spencer, Chad Smith, Juan Sanchez, David Oakley, Edward Scott, Robert Topie, Robert Nichols, William Reeder, Mark Robb, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Marv Meske, Michael McCoy, Joe Wehrle, Scott Mcanally, Dianne Pettes, John McLeod, Bear Scharbarth, Nicole Ruggeri, Ace McFarlin, Derek Ranson, Chris McCoy, Sam Peterson, Trevor Pierson, Lisa Reeder, upon Defendant General Motors LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/8/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1) (lh)
August 23, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants General Motors LLC, Merle Stone Chevrolet, Rally Auto Group, Inc., Robert Bosch GmbH, Robert Bosch LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Jennifer Perkins, Billy Perkins, Robert Williams, Britney Smith, Sam Neer, John Sujishi, Amoreena McCoy, Gerry Trias, Fred Ortiz, Bryce Monteleone, Nielsen Tauoa, Donna Miliotti, Terry Rhode, Varun Sharma, Julie Vonada, Kimberly Terry, Carlos Papion, Sahn Sirivong, Simon Smith, Matthew Nattenberg, Charles Young, Kathryn Wilcox, Alvis McWhorter, Estella Perez-Ortiz, Jerry Pettes, Janice McWhorter, Carey Wishon, Kimberly Topie, Rick Russell, Spencer White, Janel Young, Nicole Topie, Rick Solties, Dale Peabody, Rob Sauser, Dina Ranson, Janet Smith, Andrew Smith, Robin Raschke, Joey Mendoza, Mike Miliotti, Flor Trias, Edward Schultz, Glen Smith, Jason Shehan, Bryan Terry, Brenda Solties, Catherine Rhode, John White, Brent Topie, Joedy Muha, Steven Smith, Amit Sharma, Javier Soto, Mathew Storckman, Craig Sparks, Ashley Miller, James Robertson, Taylor Pantel, John Wilcox, Denise Peabody, Scott Trump, Denise Oakley, Dominic Patino, Frank Vonada, Andrea Tevini, Eugene Raschke, Linda Meske, John Spencer, Chad Smith, Juan Sanchez, David Oakley, Edward Scott, Robert Topie, Robert Nichols, William Reeder, Mark Robb, Cheri Dickson Nichols, Marv Meske, Michael McCoy, Joe Wehrle, Scott Mcanally, Dianne Pettes, John McLeod, Bear Scharbarth, Nicole Ruggeri, Ace McFarlin, Derek Ranson, Chris McCoy, Sam Peterson, Trevor Pierson, Lisa Reeder. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/9/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL, DOCUMENT 1-1 #1 ) (lh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-07343 (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice of Appearance #5 , Notice (Other) #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 8/23/2019. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow on behalf of Defendant General Motors LLC (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant General Motors LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 7.1 and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors LLC, identifying General Motors Company. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. Notice Of Pendency Of Other Actions Pursuant To L.R. 83-1.4.1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Pending Cases)(Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Bladow, Robyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19LBCV00438 Receipt No: 0973-24318348 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket) (Attorney Robyn Eileen Bladow added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft))(Bladow, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Pantel et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ruggeri
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McLeod
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Trump
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Tevini
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Sparks
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Storckman
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Scott
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Ortiz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amoreena McCoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Sanchez
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John White
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bear Scharbarth
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Terry
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Miller
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Young
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Rhode
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nielsen Tauoa
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wilcox
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Dickson Nichols
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Robb
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sahn Sirivong
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Shehan
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Monteleone
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Spencer
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Miliotti
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Vonada
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McCoy
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace McFarlin
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mcanally
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Pettes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varun Sharma
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice McWhorter
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robertson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Soto
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Raschke
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Peabody
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oakley
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Vonada
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Terry
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Topie
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Peterson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Sauser
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer White
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Wishon
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Patino
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janel Young
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Russell
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Schultz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Wehrle
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britney Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Meske
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Pierson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sujishi
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marv Meske
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estella Perez-Ortiz
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Rhode
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Ranson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Trias
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Mendoza
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Ranson
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Papion
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Peabody
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Nattenberg
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvis McWhorter
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Oakley
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Pantel
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joedy Muha
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Reeder
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Solties
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Raschke
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Smith
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Perkins
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Nichols
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Miliotti
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flor Trias
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Neer
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amit Sharma
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Solties
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Reeder
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Pettes
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Wilcox
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Perkins
Represented By: Charles W Miller
Represented By: Eric D Pearson
Represented By: Edward Eugene Angwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Robyn Eileen Bladow
Represented By: Renee D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merle Stone Chevrolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rally Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: Ryan M Sandrock
Represented By: Eric B Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?