Voltstar Technologies, Inc. v. Superior Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Voltstar Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Superior Communications, Inc., AT&T Mobility, LLC and AT and T Mobility, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07355
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Superior Communications, Inc., (Singletary, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Voltstar Technologies, Inc. filed by Defendant Superior Communications, Inc..(Singletary, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC, (Singletary, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC.(Singletary, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AT and T Mobility, LLC answer now due 10/17/2019; Superior Communications, Inc. answer now due 10/17/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants AT and T Mobility, LLC; Superior Communications, Inc..(Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party AT and T Mobility, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey M Singletary added to party Superior Communications, Inc.(pty:dft))(Singletary, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., upon Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation Systems, Inc. as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:19-cv-07355 JAK(Ex). (rn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., identifying Horizon Adventures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc. identifying Horizon Adventures, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., upon Defendant Superior Communications, Inc. served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Keith Kam, Chief Financial Officer of Superior Communications, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07355 DSF(Ex). (rn)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: plaintiff's Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Form was efiled blank without court and case information.. text area blank as to party represented and blank as to any interested party... does not correspond to "None" as cited in docketing text; date of signature missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., identifying (none). (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The Certification of Interested Parties was Incomplete. (et)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant AT and T Mobility, LLC. (et)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Superior Communications, Inc. (et)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24319634 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Voltstar Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Voltstar Technologies, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voltstar Technologies, Inc. v. Superior Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M Singletary
Represented By: Andrew Sterling Flior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT and T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Singletary
Represented By: Andrew Sterling Flior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltstar Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?