State of California et al v. Kevin K. McAleenan
Plaintiff: District of Columbia, State of Minnesota, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Maryland, State of Illinois, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Michigan, State of Maine, State of Vermont, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Washington, State of Nevada, State of Rhode Island, State of Delaware, State of New Jersey, State of Oregon, State of New York, State Of California and Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M. Azar, II, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Jomathan Hayes, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Matthew T. Albence, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kevin K. McAleenan and Mark A. Morgan
Amicus Curiae: Save the Children Federation, Inc., American Medical Association, First Focus on Children, National Association of Social Workers, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American Psychoanalytic Association, American Psychiatric Association, Center for Law and Social Policy, Jaap Doek, California Medical Association, National Education Association, Helen Stalford, ZERO TO THREE, American Academy of Pediatrics, Karabo Ozah, Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service, Ton Liefaard, Childrens Defense Fund, Ursula Kilkelly, Peter Rodrigues, American Federation of Teachers, Womens Refugee Commission, United States Fund for UNICEF, Save the Children Action Network, Inc. and American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children
Case Number: 2:2019cv07390
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 96 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Valerie M Nannery counsel for Plaintiff District of Columbia. Valerie Maria Nannery is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff District of Columbia. (Nannery, Valerie)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS IN RELATED CASE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the action is STAYED and placed in inactive status. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #32 is held in abeyance pending further proceedings in the related case, Flores v. Barr, Case No. CV 85-4544-DMG (AGRx), that may impact the force or scope of the Court's 9/27/2019 orders (Doc. Nos. 688, 690) in that case. This Order is without prejudice to the right of any party to request, at any time, that the Court reopen this action and lift the stay. The Court's Order to Show Cause Why this Action Should Not Be Dismissed as Moot #85 is DISCHARGED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alacoque Hinga Nevitt counsel for Plaintiff District of Columbia. Adding Alacoque Hinga Nevitt as counsel of record for District of Columbia for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff District of Columbia. (Attorney Alacoque Hinga Nevitt added to party District of Columbia(pty:pla))(Nevitt, Alacoque)
October 2, 2019 Filing 93 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington to Order to Show Cause (Corrigan, Virginia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 89 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending further proceedings filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, Jomathan Hayes, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robins, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Adam D. Roach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Rhode Island, designating Vilma Palma-Solana as local counsel #88 . (gk)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph T. Froehlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Michigan, designating Vilma Palma-Solana as local counsel #87 . (gk)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney B. Eric Restuccia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Michigan, designating Vilma Palma-Solana as local counsel #86 . (gk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 88 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Adam D. Roach to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Rhode Island (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24517416) filed by Plaintiff State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Vilma R Palma-Solana added to party State of Rhode Island(pty:pla)) (Palma-Solana, Vilma)
September 27, 2019 Filing 87 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph T. Froehlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Michigan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24517369) filed by Plaintiff State of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Palma-Solana, Vilma)
September 27, 2019 Filing 86 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney B. Eric Restuccia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Michigan (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24517289) filed by Plaintiff State of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Vilma R Palma-Solana added to party State of Michigan(pty:pla)) (Palma-Solana, Vilma)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AS MOOT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The parties are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, no later than October 2, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed in its entirety as moot. The hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction scheduled for October 4, 2019 is VACATED, and the Court's decision on that motion will be held in abeyance until this Order to Show Cause is discharged. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 25, 2019 Filing 84 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #32 filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Appendix, #2 Exhibit BBB to Supplemental Appendix, #3 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibits 59-77 to Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Mass, Julia)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Elena Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of New York, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #82 . (gk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 82 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elena Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of New York (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24485446) filed by Plaintiff State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 17, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Errata filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, Jomathan Hayes, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Replacement Document)(Robins, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2019 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #32 filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, Jomathan Hayes, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Robins, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of New Mexico, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #73 . (gk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Angela R. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #72 . (gk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Heidi Parry Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Nevada, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #71 . (gk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION & TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: It is hereby ORDERED that the Ex Parte Application for an order expanding the page limit for Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction by 10 pages #74 is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the Ex Parte Application for an order extending the time for Defendants to respond in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction to 9/16/2019, and also extending the time for Plaintiffs to reply to Defendants' opposition to 9/25/2019 #74 is GRANTED. (gk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 75 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Preliminary Injunction #74 filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia Harumi Mass in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Ex Parte Application)(Mass, Julia)
September 12, 2019 Filing 74 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, Jomathan Hayes, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Robins, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 73 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tania Maestas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of New Mexico (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24430038) filed by Plaintiff State of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of New Mexico(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 72 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Angela R. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24428516) filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 12, 2019 Filing 71 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Heidi Parry Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Nevada (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24428432) filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of Nevada(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua A. Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff The State of Connecticut, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #67 . (gk)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Colleen M. Melody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of Washington, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #43 , #64 . (gk)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Laura K. Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of Washington, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #42 , #63 . (gk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 67 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua A. Perry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Connecticut (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24413096) filed by Plaintiff State of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of Connecticut(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeff VanDam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Illinois, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #62 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy M. Trasande to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff the State of New York, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #61 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 64 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colleen M. Melody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24392153) filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 63 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura K. Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24392083) filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of Washington(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 62 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey VanDam to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Illinois (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24404776) filed by Plaintiff State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of Illinois(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 61 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nancy M. Trasande to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of New York (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24404701) filed by Plaintiff State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of New York(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed 9/6/2019 #42 , #43 . Plaintiffs shall file an amended Application within 14 days of this order. Failure to comply will result in the application being denied and the fees returned by the Clerk. (gk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Aimee D. Thomson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #50 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Glenn J. Moramarco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of New Jersey, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #49 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Janine W. Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Minnesota, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #48 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Abigail B. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #47 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Susan P. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Maine, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #46 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Donna S. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Delaware, designating Rebekah A. Fretz as local counsel #45 . (gk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 53 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Amicus Parties Jaap Doek, Ursula Kilkelly, Ton Liefaard, Karabo Ozah, Peter Rodrigues, Helen Stalford. RE: Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief,, #51 . (Kovanis, Victoria)
September 9, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura K. Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24392083) #42 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colleen M. Melody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24392153) #43 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE DR. JAAP DOEK, DR. URSULA KILKELLY, DR. TON LIEFAARD, MS. KARABO OZAH, DR. PETER RODRIGUES, DR. HELEN STALFORD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Ex Parte Application for leave to file Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Dr. Jaap Doek, Dr. Ursula Kilkelly, Dr. Ton Liefaard, Ms. Karabo Ozah, Dr. Peter Rodrigues, and Dr. Helen Stalford #35 is GRANTED. The proposed amicus brief attached as Exhibit 1 to the Application shall be filed on the docket within three court days of this Order. (gk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 50 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aimee D. Thomson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24395600) filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party Commonwealth of Pennsylvania(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 49 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Glenn J. Moramarco to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of New Jersey (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24395537) filed by Plaintiff State of New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of New Jersey(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 48 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Janine W. Kimble to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Minnesota (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24395430) filed by Plaintiff State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of Minnesota(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 47 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Abigail B. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24395314) filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party Commonwealth of Massachusetts(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 46 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Susan P. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Maine (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24395032) filed by Plaintiff State of Maine. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of Maine(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 45 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Donna S. Thompson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Delaware (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24394698) filed by Plaintiff State of Delaware. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State of Delaware(pty:pla)) (Fretz, Rebekah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 44 Amicus Curiae Brief filed filed by Amicus Parties American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American Federation of Teachers, American Medical Association, American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, American Psychiatric Association, American Psychoanalytic Association, California Medical Association, Center for Law and Social Policy, Childrens Defense Fund, First Focus on Children, Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service, National Association of Social Workers, National Education Association, Save the Children Action Network, Inc., Save the Children Federation, Inc., United States Fund for UNICEF, Womens Refugee Commission, ZERO TO THREE. RE: Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief,,,, #38 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Purcell, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colleen M. Melody to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 9/6/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24392153) filed by Of Attorneys for Plaintiff State of Washington State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Heintz, Tera)
September 6, 2019 Filing 42 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Laura K. Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24392083) filed by Of Attorneys for Plaintiff State of Washington State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Heintz, Tera)
September 6, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Tera M Heintz on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington (Attorney Tera M Heintz added to party State of Washington(pty:pla))(Heintz, Tera)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 4, 2019 Filing 39 EX PARTE APPLICATION to CORRECT EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief #33 filed by Amici Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American Federation of Teachers, American Medical Association, American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, American Psychiatric Association, American Psychoanalytic Association, California Medical Association, Center for Law and Social Policy, Childrens Defense Fund, First Focus on Children, Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service, National Association of Social Workers, National Education Association, Save the Children Action Network, Inc., Save the Children Federation, Inc., United States Fund for UNICEF, Womens Refugee Commission, ZERO TO THREE. (Attachments: #1 corrected Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Proposed Amicus Brief of Amici Curiae) (Purcell, John)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the ex parte application of the American Academy of Pediatrics, the American Academy of Pediatrics, California, the American Federation of Teachers, the American Medical Association, the American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, the American Psychiatric Association, the American Psychoanalytic Association, the California Medical Association, the Center for Law and Social Policy, the Children's Defense Fund, the Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service, the National Association of Social Workers, the National Education Association, and the Women's Refugee Commission, together with First Focus on Children, Inc., Save the Children Action Network, Inc., Save the Children Federation, Inc., UNICEF USA, and ZERO TO THREE to file a brief of amici curiae #33 is GRANTED. The proposed brief and supporting declaration submitted with the ex parte application must be filed separately on the docket within three court days. (gk)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit for an oversize brief in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction #31 . Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction of 35 pages total is accepted. (gk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 8/29/2019. The case number will now read CV 19-7390-DMG (AGRx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. Further, the Court hereby RESETS Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #32 to 10/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 35 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amici Curiae Jaap Doek, Ursula Kilkelly, Ton Liefaard, Karabo Ozah, Peter Rodrigues, Helen Stalford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Declaration of Victoria Kovanis in Support of Ex Parte Application, #3 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application) (Attorney Victoria Kovanis added to party Jaap Doek(pty:am), Attorney Victoria Kovanis added to party Ursula Kilkelly(pty:am), Attorney Victoria Kovanis added to party Ton Liefaard(pty:am), Attorney Victoria Kovanis added to party Karabo Ozah(pty:am), Attorney Victoria Kovanis added to party Peter Rodrigues(pty:am), Attorney Victoria Kovanis added to party Helen Stalford(pty:am)) (Kovanis, Victoria)
September 3, 2019 Filing 33 EX PARTE APPLICATION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amici Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Pediatrics, California, American Federation of Teachers, American Medical Association, American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children, American Psychiatric Association, American Psychoanalytic Association, California Medical Association, Center for Law and Social Policy, Childrens Defense Fund, Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service, National Association of Social Workers, National Education Association, Womens Refugee Commission, First Focus on Children, Save the Children Action Network, Inc., Save the Children Federation, Inc., United States Fund for UNICEF, ZERO TO THREE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney John S Purcell added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party American Academy of Pediatrics, California(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party American Federation of Teachers(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party American Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party American Psychiatric Association(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party American Psychoanalytic Association(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party California Medical Association(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party Center for Law and Social Policy(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party Childrens Defense Fund(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party National Association of Social Workers(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party National Education Association(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party Womens Refugee Commission(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party First Focus on Children(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party Save the Children Action Network, Inc.(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party Save the Children Federation, Inc.(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party United States Fund for UNICEF(pty:am), Attorney John S Purcell added to party ZERO TO THREE(pty:am)) (Purcell, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. Motion set for hearing on 9/30/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Appendix in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit A to Z to Appendix, #3 Exhibit AA to AAA to Appendix, #4 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit 1 to 11 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit 12 to 30 to Request for Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit 31 to 36 to Request for Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit 37 to 49 to Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit 50 to 58 to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Proposed Order) (Mass, Julia)
August 30, 2019 Filing 31 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exceed Page Limitation to 35 pages filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia Harumi Mass, #2 Proposed Order) (Mass, Julia)
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, Jomathan Hayes, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcementto Notice of Related Case(s),, #3 (Robins, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey S Robins on behalf of Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, Jomathan Hayes, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party Alex M. Azar, II(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party Jomathan Hayes(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party Kevin K. McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party Mark A. Morgan(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party Office of Refugee Resettlement(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party U.S. Customs and Border Protection(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party U.S. Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey S Robins added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Robins, Jeffrey)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff State of California, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Nicola T. Hanna, U.S. Attorney for the Central District of California. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to not specified. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to not specified. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Mass, Julia)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:85-cv-04544 DMG(AGRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge John F. Walter to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07390 DMG(AGRx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn)
August 27, 2019 Filing 27 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Matthew T. Albence, Alex M. Azar, II, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mark A. Morgan, Office of Refugee Resettlement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Laura K. Clinton. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Colleen M. Melody. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Julio A. Thompson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Adam D. Roach. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Aimee D. Thomson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nancy Transande. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tania Maesta. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Glenn J. Moramarco. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Heidi Parry Stern. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Janine Kimble. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney B. Eric Restuccia. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey P. Dunlap. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susan P. Herman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeff VanDam. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Donna Thompson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joshua Perry. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Angela Brooks. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (lh)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rebekah A. Fretz on behalf of Plaintiff State Of California (Attorney Rebekah A. Fretz added to party State Of California(pty:pla))(Fretz, Rebekah)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Virginia Elizabeth Corrigan on behalf of Plaintiff State Of California (Attorney Virginia Elizabeth Corrigan added to party State Of California(pty:pla))(Corrigan, Virginia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Vilma R Palma-Solana on behalf of Plaintiff State Of California (Attorney Vilma R Palma-Solana added to party State Of California(pty:pla))(Palma-Solana, Vilma)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71), #2 , Notice of Related Case(s),, #3 filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State Of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Caption of Complaint, #2 Exhibit Service List)(Mass, Julia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State Of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. Related Case(s): 2:85-cv-4544 (Mass, Julia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State Of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Washington. (Mass, Julia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24327390 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff State of Nevada, State of Maine, State of Rhode Island, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State Of California, State of Vermont, State of New Mexico, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Illinois, State of Connecticut, State of Michigan, State of New Jersey, State of Washington, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Maryland, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Minnesota, District of Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Flores Settlement Agreement) (Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party Commonwealth of Massachusetts(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party Commonwealth of Pennsylvania(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party Commonwealth of Virginia(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party District of Columbia(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State Of California(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Connecticut(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Delaware(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Illinois(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Maine(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Maryland(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Michigan(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Minnesota(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of New Jersey(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of New Mexico(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of New York(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Oregon(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Rhode Island(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Vermont(pty:pla), Attorney Julia Harumi Mass added to party State of Washington(pty:pla))(Mass, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Alacoque Hinga Nevitt
Represented By: Valerie M Nannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Janine W Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Michelle Shane Kallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Jeff Vandam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Joshua A Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Tania Maestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Vilma R Palma-Solana
Represented By: B Eric Restuccia
Represented By: Joseph T Froehlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maine
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Susan P Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Abigail B Taylor
Represented By: Angela Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: Laura K Clinton
Represented By: Colleen M Melody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Heidi Parry Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Vilma R Palma-Solana
Represented By: Adam D Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Donna S Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Glenn J Moramarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: J Nicole DeFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Elena Goldstein
Represented By: Nancy M Trasande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of California
Represented By: Virginia Elizabeth Corrigan
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Vilma R Palma-Solana
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Marisol Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Rebekah A. Fretz
Represented By: Aimee D Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jomathan Hayes
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Refugee Resettlement
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Morgan
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Save the Children Federation, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: First Focus on Children
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Social Workers
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics, California
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Psychoanalytic Association
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Psychiatric Association
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center for Law and Social Policy
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jaap Doek
Represented By: Andrew P Crousore
Represented By: Victoria Kovanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Medical Association
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Education Association
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Helen Stalford
Represented By: Andrew P Crousore
Represented By: Victoria Kovanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ZERO TO THREE
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Karabo Ozah
Represented By: Andrew P Crousore
Represented By: Victoria Kovanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Lutheran Immigration and Refugee Service
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ton Liefaard
Represented By: Andrew P Crousore
Represented By: Victoria Kovanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Childrens Defense Fund
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ursula Kilkelly
Represented By: Andrew P Crousore
Represented By: Victoria Kovanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Peter Rodrigues
Represented By: Andrew P Crousore
Represented By: Victoria Kovanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Womens Refugee Commission
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States Fund for UNICEF
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Save the Children Action Network, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Professional Society on the Abuse of Children
Represented By: Justin Alan Goldberg
Represented By: John S Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?