Herlinda Correa v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Herlinda Correa
Defendant: Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc. Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv07413
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Herlinda Correa, upon Defendant Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc. Disability Plan acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Robert E. Hess, Attorney for Defendant. (Zietz, Kevin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company answer now due 10/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Attorney Robert E Hess added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hess, Robert)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Herlinda Correa, upon Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Zietz, Kevin)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc. Disability Plan. (ghap)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Herlinda Correa, identifying Herlinda Correa, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc. Disability Plan. (Zietz, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Herlinda Correa. (Zietz, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Herlinda Correa. (Zietz, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24332222 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Herlinda Correa. (Attorney Kevin M Zietz added to party Herlinda Correa(pty:pla))(Zietz, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herlinda Correa v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc. Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herlinda Correa
Represented By: Kevin M Zietz
Represented By: Todd Krauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?