Barbara A. Samuels v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Samuels
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv07447
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-7447 SHK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
September 29, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Barbara A. Samuels, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 served on 9/16/19. (Lowenstein, Janna)
September 29, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Barbara A. Samuels, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 9/16/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lowenstein, Janna)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Barbara A. Samuels. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (jtil)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Barbara A. Samuels. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Barbara A. Samuels, identifying United States Social Security Administration. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Barbara A. Samuels. (Lowenstein, Janna)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24338035 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Barbara A. Samuels. (Attorney Janna K Lowenstein added to party Barbara A. Samuels(pty:pla))(Lowenstein, Janna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbara A. Samuels v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Samuels
Represented By: Janna K Lowenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?