Salvador Aguirre v. Westrock Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Aguirre
Defendant: Aaron Amaya, Westrock Services LLC, Does 1 through 100, Liz Ramos, Rudy Rodriguez and BHS Corrugated North American Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07568
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Aaron Amaya, Liz Ramos, Westrock Services LLC filed by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Liz Ramos, Westrock Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A - G, #3 Proposed Order) (Friedman, Talya)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Aaron Amaya, Liz Ramos, Westrock Services LLC filed by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Liz Ramos, Westrock Services LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/25/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A - G, #3 Proposed Order) (Friedman, Talya)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Defendants Aaron Amaya, Liz Ramos, Westrock Services LLC. Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Friedman, Talya)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: JURISDICTION (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: In this case, the basis for the Court's subject-matter jurisdiction is unclear. The Court therefore ORDERS Westrock to show cause, in writing, no later than October 28, 2019, why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file a response to Defendant Westrock's filing no later than November 4, 2019. (bm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aaron Amaya answer now due 11/21/2019; Liz Ramos answer now due 11/21/2019; Westrock Services LLC answer now due 11/21/2019, filed by Defendants Aaron Amaya; Liz Ramos; Westrock Services LLC.(Attorney Talya Friedman added to party Aaron Amaya(pty:dft), Attorney Talya Friedman added to party Liz Ramos(pty:dft))(Friedman, Talya)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BHS Corrugated North American Inc..(Attorney Naaman Asir Fiola added to party BHS Corrugated North American Inc.(pty:dft))(Fiola, Naaman)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguirre.. (Donahue, Timothy)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 JOINDER filed by Defendant BHS Corrugated North American Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Kinsberg, Shaina)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
August 30, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Westrock Services LLC. (filed in state court 8/29/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 5)(esa)
August 30, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Aaron Amaya, BHS Corrugated North American Inc., Does, Liz Ramos, Rudy Rodriguez, Westrock Services LLC, filed by plaintiff Salvador Aguirre (submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa)
August 30, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Westrock Services LLC. (filed in state court 7/29/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 3, p. 2)(esa)
August 30, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguirre, upon Defendant BHS Corrugated North American Inc. served on 5/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 6/13/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 7, p. 5) (esa)
August 30, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Salvador Aguirre, upon Defendant Westrock Services LLC served on 5/31/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 6/13/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 7, p. 6) (esa)
August 30, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Aaron Amaya, BHS Corrugated North American Inc., Does, Liz Ramos, Rudy Rodriguez, Westrock Services LLC, filed by plaintiff Salvador Aguirre. (filed in state court 5/20/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 12) (esa)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Westrock Services LLC identifying WestRock Company as Corporate Parent. (Friedman, Talya)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Westrock Services LLC, identifying Plaintiff Salvador Aguirre, Defendant WestRock Services, Inc., Defendant Liz Ramos, Defendant Rudy Rodriguez, Defendant Aaron Amaya, Defendant BHS Corrugated North American Inc.. (Friedman, Talya)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Westrock Services LLC. (Friedman, Talya)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19NWCV00423 Receipt No: 0973-24358798 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Westrock Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Declaration of Jennifer Colucci, #9 Declaration of Kevin Alden Maxwell) (Attorney Talya Friedman added to party Westrock Services LLC(pty:dft))(Friedman, Talya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador Aguirre v. Westrock Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Amaya
Represented By: Talya Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westrock Services LLC
Represented By: Talya Friedman
Represented By: Shaina L Kinsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Ramos
Represented By: Talya Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rudy Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHS Corrugated North American Inc.
Represented By: Naaman Asir Fiola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Aguirre
Represented By: Timothy J Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?