Angelica R. Untalan v. Warren A. Stanley et al
Plaintiff: Angelica R. Untalan
Defendant: Joseph Zagorski, Justin Vaughan, Joseph Farrow, Tariq D. Johnson, Warren A. Stanley, Paola Trinidad, Jonathan Cochran and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv07599
Filed: September 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The previous order is DISCHARGED with no further consequence. re: Response #10 . (vm)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Angelica R. Untalan. correcting Response #10 Plaintiffs Notice of Erratum re Report Regarding Status of Service (Doc. 10) (Cook, Donald)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Angelica R. Untalanto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #9 Plaintiff's Report Regarding Status of Service (Cook, Donald)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STATUS REPORT ON SERVICE OF PROCESS IN CIVIL ACTION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a statement (not to exceed 3 pages) plus proof of service of process by or before October 15, 2019. (See document for further details) (vm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued as to defendant Jonathan Cochran, Joseph Farrow, Tariq D. Johnson, Warren A. Stanley, Paola Trinidad, Justin Vaughan, Joseph Zagorski. re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (vm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angelica R. Untalan. (Cook, Donald)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
September 2, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angelica R. Untalan. (Cook, Donald)
September 2, 2019 Filing 3 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angelica R. Untalan, (Cook, Donald)
September 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angelica R. Untalan. (Cook, Donald)
September 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24364415 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Angelica R. Untalan. (Attorney Donald Webster Cook added to party Angelica R. Untalan(pty:pla))(Cook, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angelica R. Untalan v. Warren A. Stanley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Zagorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tariq D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren A. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paola Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica R. Untalan
Represented By: Donald Webster Cook
Represented By: Leah Paula Gasser-Ordaz
Represented By: Milinda Kakani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?