Karen Jensen v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kara Jensen
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv07612
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kara Jensen. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kara Jensen, upon Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America served on 9/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent, by serving Becky DeGeorge, authorized agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America answer now due 10/25/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Maguire, Daniel)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:19-cv-07612 JAK(Ex). (rn)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Kara Jensen. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (et)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV11C- Statement of Consent) (et)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kara Jensen. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kara Jensen, (Kantor, Glenn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kara Jensen. (Kantor, Glenn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24368303 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kara Jensen. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Kara Jensen(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Jensen v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Jensen
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?