Cindy Uyenoyama et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: John Toda, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Gini Michelle Cox, William Braden, Shelia Cauthen, Earl Kladke, David Conroe, Cindy Uyenoyama, Richard Schellhammer, Vanessa Rodriguez, Crystal Robinson, Norman Ganon, Maxine Glenn, Shon Reeves, April Bradley, Benito Guzman and Normand Gagnon
Defendant: General Motors, LLC, General Motors Company and General Motors Holdings LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07668
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael R Wilner
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Documents in Connection with Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant General Motors Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmer, Andrew)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Allyson M. McKinstry APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant General Motors LLC, designating Andrew J.W. Holmer as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Kathleen T. Sooy APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant General Motors LLC, designating Andrew J.W. Holmer as local counsel. (mrgo)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Allyson M. McKinstry to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors Holdings LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24665595) filed by Defendant General Motors Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Holmer, Andrew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kathleen T. Sooy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant General Motors Holdings LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24665531) filed by Defendant General Motors Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party General Motors Holdings LLC(pty:dft)) (Holmer, Andrew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants General Motors, LLC, General Motors Holdings LLC, General Motors Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs April Bradley, Maxine Glenn, Vanessa Rodriguez, Cindy Uyenoyama, John Toda, Shon Reeves, Crystal Robinson, Benito Guzman, Gini Michelle Cox, Richard Schellhammer, David Conroe, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, William Braden, Shelia Cauthen, Norman Ganon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Blatt, Gayle)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff April Bradley, Maxine Glenn, Vanessa Rodriguez, Cindy Uyenoyama, John Toda, Shon Reeves, Crystal Robinson, Benito Guzman, Gini Michelle Cox, Richard Schellhammer, David Conroe, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, William Braden, Shelia Cauthen, Norman Ganon, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Barbara Greene, Process Clerk, CSC for Registered Agent for Service of Process for Defendant General Motors, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Blatt, Gayle)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to General Motors, LLC answer now due 11/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Defendant General Motors, LLC.(Holmer, Andrew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Motors, LLC, identifying General Motors Holdings, LLC and General Motors Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Attorney Andrew John William Holmer added to party General Motors, LLC(pty:dft))(Holmer, Andrew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant General Motors, LLC identifying General Motors Company as Corporate Parent. (Holmer, Andrew)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant General Motors, LLC. (yl)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request, #3 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #7 filed by Plaintiff William Braden, April Bradley, Shelia Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Norman Ganon, Maxine Glenn, Benito Guzman, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Shon Reeves, Crystal Robinson, Vanessa Rodriguez, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Cindy Uyenoyama. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Blatt, Gayle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff William Braden, April Bradley, Shelia Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Norman Ganon, Maxine Glenn, Benito Guzman, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Shon Reeves, Crystal Robinson, Vanessa Rodriguez, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Cindy Uyenoyama. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs William Braden, April Bradley, Shelia Cauthen, David Conroe, Gini Michelle Cox, Norman Ganon, Maxine Glenn, Benito Guzman, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, Shon Reeves, Crystal Robinson, Vanessa Rodriguez, Richard Schellhammer, John Toda, Cindy Uyenoyama. (Blatt, Gayle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 09/04/2019, receipt number 0973-24379694), filed by Plaintiff April Bradley, Maxine Glenn, Vanessa Rodriguez, Cindy Uyenoyama, John Toda, Shon Reeves, Crystal Robinson, Benito Guzman, Gini Michelle Cox, Richard Schellhammer, David Conroe, Earl Kladke, Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa, William Braden, Shelia Cauthen, Norman Ganon. (Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party William Braden(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party April Bradley(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Shelia Cauthen(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party David Conroe(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Gini Michelle Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Norman Ganon(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Maxine Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Benito Guzman(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Earl Kladke(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Shon Reeves(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Crystal Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Vanessa Rodriguez(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Richard Schellhammer(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party John Toda(pty:pla), Attorney Gayle M Blatt added to party Cindy Uyenoyama(pty:pla))(Blatt, Gayle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cindy Uyenoyama et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Toda
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariano Lorenzo Macaisa
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gini Michelle Cox
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Braden
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Cauthen
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Kladke
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Conroe
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Uyenoyama
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Schellhammer
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Rodriguez
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Robinson
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Ganon
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxine Glenn
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shon Reeves
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Bradley
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benito Guzman
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Normand Gagnon
Represented By: Gayle M Blatt
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Kevin O Moon
Represented By: David Sisco Casey
Represented By: David Seabold Casey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher D Moon
Represented By: Seth H Barron
Represented By: Patricia Camille Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen T Sooy
Represented By: Allyson M McKinstry
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Holdings LLC
Represented By: Andrew John William Holmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?