In the Matter of the Complaint of Truth Aquatics, Inc. and Glen Richard Fritzler and Dana Jeanne Fritzler Featured Case
Plaintiff: Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc and Dana Jeanne Fritzler
Defendant: 1 through 20 DOES
Case Number: 2:2019cv07693
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RESTRAINING ALL SUITS AND DIRECTING MONITION TO ISSUE by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a monition issue out of and under the seal of this Court to all persons and entities asserting any claim with respect to that which the Complaint in this action seeks exoneration from, or limitation of, liability, admonishing them to file their respective claims with the Clerk of this Court at the United States Courthouse, in writing and under oath, and to serve a copy thereof on the attorneys for PLAINTIFFS, on or before the July 1, 2020 #13 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING EXECUTION OF MONITION AND PUBLICATION OF NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson. NOW, THEREFORE, PLAINTIFFS ARE HEREBY COMMANDED to notify and admonish all persons asserting claims with respect to that which the Complaint herein seeks exoneration from, or limitation of, liability for, to appear and answer the allegations of the Complaint, and to file their claims, with the Clerk of the Court, on or before the July 1, 2020. PLAINTIFFS ARE FURTHER COMMANDED to publish, or cause to be published, in The Los Angeles Times, a newspaper of general circulation printed and published in Los Angeles County, California, a notice in substantially the form of the NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM, OR LIMITATION OF, LIABILITY, once each week for four (4) successive weeks beginning no later than October 10, 2019. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION FOR VALUE AND COSTS by Judge Percy Anderson: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Stipulation for Value and Costs is approved. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Approval Of Stipulation For Value And Costs, Order Restraining All Suits And Directing Monition To Issue And Order Directing Execution Of Monition And Publication Of Notice #5 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation for Value and Costs, #2 Proposed Order Restraining All Suits and Directing Monition to Issue, #3 Proposed Order Directing Execution of Monition and Publication of Notice)(Brown, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Lauralee Meade re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Approval Of Stipulation For Value And Costs, Order Restraining All Suits And Directing Monition To Issue And Order Directing Execution Of Monition And Publication Of Notice #5 filed by Plaintiffs Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc. (Brown, Russell)
September 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 1 through 20 DOES amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Truth Aquatics Inc, Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler(Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Russell Brown re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Approval Of Stipulation For Value And Costs, Order Restraining All Suits And Directing Monition To Issue And Order Directing Execution Of Monition And Publication Of Notice #5 filed by Plaintiffs Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc. (Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiffs Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc. Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Approval Of Stipulation For Value And Costs, Order Restraining All Suits And Directing Monition To Issue And Order Directing Execution Of Monition And Publication Of Notice #5 (Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Approval Of Stipulation For Value And Costs, Order Restraining All Suits And Directing Monition To Issue And Order Directing Execution Of Monition And Publication Of Notice filed by Plaintiffs Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc. (Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COMPLAINT For Exoneration From Or Limitation Of Liability filed by Plaintiffs Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc. (Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc, identifying Truth Aquatics, Inc.; Glen Richard Fritzler And Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Individually And As Trustees Of The Fritzler Family Trust DTD 7/27/92; Argonaut Insurance Company; National Casualty Company; National Casualty Company; Great American Insurance Company. (Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler, Truth Aquatics Inc. (Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24385214 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Truth Aquatics Inc, Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler. (Attorney Russell Patric Brown added to party Dana Jeanne Fritzler(pty:pla), Attorney Russell Patric Brown added to party Glen Richard Fritzler(pty:pla), Attorney Russell Patric Brown added to party Truth Aquatics Inc(pty:pla))(Brown, Russell)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24385214 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Truth Aquatics Inc, Dana Jeanne Fritzler, Glen Richard Fritzler. (Attorney Russell Patric Brown added to party Dana Jeanne Fritzler(pty:pla), Attorney Russell Patric Brown added to party Glen Richard Fritzler(pty:pla), Attorney Russell Patric Brown added to party Truth Aquatics Inc(pty:pla))(Brown, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of Truth Aquatics, Inc. and Glen Richard Fritzler and Dana Jeanne Fritzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Richard Fritzler
Represented By: Russell Patric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truth Aquatics Inc
Represented By: Russell Patric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Jeanne Fritzler
Represented By: Russell Patric Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 through 20 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?