Gabriel Rosas Ybarra v. Alaska Airlines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Rosas Ybarra
Defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc., Virgin America Inc., Doe No. 1-Flight Attendant and DOES 2 to 100, inclusvie, and each of them
Case Number: 2:2019cv07701
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed on 9/19/2019 #10 , the Court hereby DISMISSES this action without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(ii). The Order to Show Cause dated 9/16/2019 #9 is discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Rosas Ybarra. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Marzban, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiff's Complaint indicates a lack of complete diversity because he and Virgin America are both California citizens. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not dismiss this action, without prejudice, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a response within 14 days of the date of this Order. Failure to timely file a satisfactory response by this deadline will result in the dismissal of this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc. and Virgin America Inc. (jtil)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Rosas Ybarra. (Marzban, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Rosas Ybarra. (Marzban, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (400.00 paid on 09/05/19, receipt number 26K0IDJ3), filed by Plaintiff Gabriel Rosas Ybarra.(Marzban, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Michael M Marzban added to party Gabriel Rosas Ybarra(pty:pla))(Marzban, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel Rosas Ybarra v. Alaska Airlines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe No. 1-Flight Attendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 2 to 100, inclusvie, and each of them
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Rosas Ybarra
Represented By: Michael M Marzban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?