Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Swiss RE International SE, Lexington Insurance Company, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, Swiss Re International SE-Zurich and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv07730
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs' Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss Re International SE-Zurich. Dismissal is without Prejudice. (Block, Mark)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Scottsdale Insurance Company answer now due 10/24/2019, filed by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Attorney Christine Marie Emanuelson added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Emanuelson, Christine)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Swiss Re International SE-Zurich, Lexington Insurance Company, upon Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DeAnne Schauseil, Corp Service Co. Agent Authorized to Accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Tittmann, Raymond)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-2893 SVW (GJSx) (esa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. (jp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss Re International SE-Zurich. (Tittmann, Raymond)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss Re International SE-Zurich. Related Case(s): 18-cv-02893-SVW-GJS (Tittmann, Raymond)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss Re International SE-Zurich. (Tittmann, Raymond)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE, (Tittmann, Raymond)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiff CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE. (Tittmann, Raymond)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE. (Tittmann, Raymond)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24393026 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON, Lexington Insurance Company, Swiss RE International SE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Raymond J Tittmann added to party CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond J Tittmann added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Raymond J Tittmann added to party Swiss RE International SE(pty:pla))(Tittmann, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiss RE International SE
Represented By: Raymond J Tittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond J Tittmann
Represented By: Mark L Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON
Represented By: Raymond J Tittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiss Re International SE-Zurich
Represented By: Raymond J Tittmann
Represented By: Mark L Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London
Represented By: Raymond J Tittmann
Represented By: Mark L Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc S Hines
Represented By: Christine Marie Emanuelson
Represented By: Tuyet T Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?