Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc. v. Fagron Compounding Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, AnazaoHealth Corporation and JCB Laboratories, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07748
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence D. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NY missing. (lt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 43 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by DEFENDANTS AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC. (Robbins, Ellen)
November 4, 2019 Filing 42 Joint STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #22 WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO PERMIT FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
November 4, 2019 Filing 41 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lawrence D. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24719292) filed by Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Robbins, Ellen)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference is set for 12/9/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj)
October 21, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Craig Sherman, M.D. In Support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #38 [Supplemental Declaration] filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J-L)(Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
October 21, 2019 Filing 38 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
October 16, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/08/2019 at 11:31 a.m. re Transcript #36 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Ponce, Myra) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2019 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/08/2019 at 11:31 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Myra L. Ponce, CSR, RDR, CRR, e-mail address myraponce@sbcglobal.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2020. (Ponce, Myra)
October 15, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC.(Robbins, Ellen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Annie Tualla at annie.tualla@akerman.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Robbins, Ellen)
October 8, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION (Filed10/4/2019) #27 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder:On the Courts own motion, the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #22 is continued from October 28, 2019, to December 2, 2019, at 10:00 A.M. The Court sets the briefing as follows: Defendants Opposition shall be due on or before November 4, 2019; and Plaintiffs Reply shall be due on or before November 18, 2019. Defendants Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction or In the Alternative, Extending Defendants Deadline to File An Opposition is moot. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (lc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING by Judge Christina A. Snyder re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or In the Alternative, Extending Defendants' Deadline to File An Opposition #27 , Declaration in Support #29 and Objection/Opposition #31 . Telephone Conference is set for 10/8/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. All parties are ordered to discuss the matter with their clients and opposing counsel prior to the telephone conference. Counsel for PLAINTIFF is ordered to initiate the telephone conference call THROUGH THE TELEPHONE OPERATOR to include all counsel of record, and CHAMBERS at (213) 894-8551 on the date and time scheduled. If the Courts conference line is busy, continue to try to connect, the Court may be finalizing a previous conference call. Counsel shall be available 30 minutes prior and 30 minutes after the time scheduled for the telephone conference.NOTE: During the telephone hearing, counsel must identify themselves before they speak for the benefit of the Court and the Court Reporter.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or In the Alternative, Extending Defendants' Deadline to File An Opposition - Hearing from October 28, 2019 to December 9, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTIO #27 filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Craig Sherman in Support of Hope Medical Enterprises' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit 1-4 to Craig Sherman Declaration, #3 Declaration of Joseph N. Akrotirianakis in Support of Hope Medical Enterprises' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application)(Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: See Below Under Other re proposed orders. Other error(s) with document(s): As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed order is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Ellen S. Robbins Regarding Notice to Opposing Counsel of Defendants' EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or In the Alternative, Extending Defendants' Deadline to File An Opposition - Hearing from October 28, 2019 to December 9, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTIO #27 filed by Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC. (Robbins, Ellen)
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or In the Alternative, Extending Defendants' Deadline to File An Opposition - Hearing from October 28, 2019 to December 9, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTIO #27 filed by Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC. (Robbins, Ellen)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction or In the Alternative, Extending Defendants' Deadline to File An Opposition - Hearing from October 28, 2019 to December 9, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #22 filed by Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ellen E. Robbins with Exhibit A to C) (Robbins, Ellen)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC, (Robbins, Ellen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to AnazaoHealth Corporation answer now due 10/15/2019; JCB Laboratories, LLC answer now due 10/15/2019; Fagron Compounding Services, LLC answer now due 10/15/2019; Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC answer now due 10/15/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation; JCB Laboratories, LLC; Fagron Compounding Services, LLC; Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC.(Robbins, Ellen)
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ellen S Robbins counsel for Defendants AnazaoHealth Corporation, Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC, Fagron Compounding Services, LLC, JCB Laboratories, LLC. Adding Ellen S. Robbins as counsel of record for Fagron Compounding Services, LLC; JCB Laboratories, LLC; Anazaohealth Corporation; Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Fagron Compounding Services, LLC; JCB Laboratories, LLC; Anazaohealth Corporation; Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC. (Attorney Ellen S Robbins added to party AnazaoHealth Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Ellen S Robbins added to party Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ellen S Robbins added to party Fagron Compounding Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ellen S Robbins added to party JCB Laboratories, LLC(pty:dft))(Robbins, Ellen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #22 filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J, #2 Exhibit K-Q, #3 Exhibit R-Y, #4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice)(Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph N. Akrotirianakis, #2 Exhibit A-F to the Declaration of Joseph N. Akrotirianakis, #3 Declaration of Craig Sherman, #4 Exhibit A-E to the Declaration of Craig Sherman, #5 Exhibit E-1 to the Declaration of Craig Sherman, #6 Exhibit E-2 to the Declaration of Craig Sherman, #7 Exhibit F-I to the Declaration of Craig Sherman, #8 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant AnazaoHealth Corporation served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tanya Mock, clerk authorized to accept service of process on behalf of CT Corporation, agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 18, 2019 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tanya Mock, clerk authorized to accept service of process on behalf of CT Corporation, agent for service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant JCB Laboratories, LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melinda Forge, clerk authorized to accept service of process on behalf of The Corporation Company, Inc., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc., upon Defendant Fagron Compounding Services, LLC served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Fillippo Carnemolla, Process Specialist, authorized to accept service of process on behalf of CT Corporation System in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge David O. Carter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:17-cv-01550 DOC(JDEx) (rn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:17-cv-01550-DOC-JDE; 8:17-cv-01551-DOC-JDE (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant JCB Laboratories, LLC. (esa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Fagron Compounding Services, LLC. (esa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC. (esa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant AnazaoHealth Corporation. (esa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (esa)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc., (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Akrotirianakis, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24396563 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-P) (Attorney Joseph N Akrotirianakis added to party Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla))(Akrotirianakis, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc. v. Fagron Compounding Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coast Quality Pharmacy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fagron Compounding Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AnazaoHealth Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCB Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Medical Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph N Akrotirianakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?