Helen Vanvakaris v. Fashion Forms, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vanvakaris Helen
Defendant: Fashion Forms, Inc., a Texas corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv07765
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion for Remand #8 presently scheduled for hearing on November 8, 2019, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. Further, the scheduling conference on November 8, 2019 is also VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 26F JOINT REPORT REPORT of RULE 26F JOINT REPORT filed by Plaintiff Helen Vanvakaris. (Dayalan, Arun)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY Reply to Opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 filed by Plaintiff Helen Vanvakaris. (Dayalan, Arun)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by Defendant Fashion Forms, Inc.. (Meyer, Filomena)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 filed by Defendant Fashion Forms, Inc.. (Meyer, Filomena)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continues the scheduling conference from November 1, 2019t o November 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Helen Vanvakaris. Motion set for hearing on 11/8/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arun Dayalan, #2 Exhibit 1) (Dayalan, Arun)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
September 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Helen Vanvakaris, upon Defendant Fashion Forms, Inc. served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Beverly Ann Deal Registered Agent for Fashion Forms, Inc. a Texas corporation in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Filed in State Court on 8/23/19 Submitted with Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 9/10/2019 (car).
September 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Fashion Forms, Inc. Filed in State Court on 9/6/2019 Submitted with Exhibit C to notice of removal #1 .(car) Modified on 9/10/2019 (car).
September 9, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Does 1-100, Fashion Forms, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Helen Vanvakaris. Filed in State Court on 6/27/2019 Submitted with attachment 1 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fashion Forms, Inc., a Texas corporation. (Meyer, Filomena)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fashion Forms, Inc., a Texas corporation, (Meyer, Filomena)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV22484 Receipt No: 0973-24402285 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fashion Forms, Inc., a Texas corporation. (Attorney Filomena E Meyer added to party Fashion Forms, Inc., a Texas corporation(pty:dft))(Meyer, Filomena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helen Vanvakaris v. Fashion Forms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Forms, Inc., a Texas corporation
Represented By: Filomena E Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanvakaris Helen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?