The Dentists Insurance Company v. Broan Nutone, LLC
Plaintiff: The Dentists Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC, Broan Nutone, LLC and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv07812
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following: Discovery cut-off 5/22/2020. Motions due by 7/27/2020. Last date to conduct mediation is 4/24/2020. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement and Proposed Order filed by Defendant Broan Nutone, LLC and Plaintiff The Dentists Insurance Company (Thai, Sinny)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by The Dentists Insurance Company The Dentists Insurance Company.(Alper, Dean)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by The Dentists Insurance Company The Dentists Insurance Company, identifying Plaintiff. (Alper, Dean)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff The Dentists Insurance Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/15/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC. of Filing Answer in State Court Before Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thai, Sinny)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC, identifying The Dentists Insurance Company; Broan-NuTone LLC; Nortek, Inc.. (Thai, Sinny)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Thai, Sinny)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC.. (Thai, Sinny)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC. Related Case(s): N/A (Thai, Sinny)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Sinny B. Thai re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thai, Sinny)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19GDCV01043 Receipt No: 0973-24408878 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Broan-Nutone, LLC. (Attorney Sinny B Thai added to party Broan-Nutone, LLC(pty:dft))(Thai, Sinny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Dentists Insurance Company v. Broan Nutone, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Sinny B Thai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Sinny B Thai
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Philip Emory McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Dentists Insurance Company
Represented By: Dean A Alper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?