G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Ramona Guadalupe Gonzalez-Zazueta et al
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Adolfo Valenzuela and Ramona G Gonzalez-Zazueta
Case Number: 2:2019cv07813
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ramona Guadalupe Gonzalez-Zazueta answer now due 11/22/2019; G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC answer now due 11/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendants Adolfo Valenzuela; Ramona Guadalupe Gonzalez-Zazueta.(Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Ramona Guadalupe Gonzalez-Zazueta (pty:dft), Attorney Anthony R Lopez added to party Adolfo Valenzuela(pty:dft))(Lopez, Anthony)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, upon Defendant Adolfo Valenzuela served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, upon Defendant Ramona Guadalupe Gonzalez-Zazueta served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 19-03, all related G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. cases have been assigned to Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Related Group Control Number is CV 10-00128-WDK(JCx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ramona Guadalupe Gonzalez-Zazueta. (ghap)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Adolfo Valenzuela. (ghap)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge William D. Keller and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Riley, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24409383 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Ramona Guadalupe Gonzalez-Zazueta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolfo Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona G Gonzalez-Zazueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?