Sylvia Parker v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sylvia Parker
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. and Does 1-6
Case Number: 2:2019cv07814
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION filed by plaintiff Sylvia Parker to Defendant's Notice of Appearance #15 . (mrgo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF VEXATIOUS LITIGATION RULE by Judge George H. Wu. In accordance with Local Rule 83-8, Plaintiff is placed on notice that if she continues to file additional actions in federal court related to the same state court property disputes that are the subject of this now dismissed action, she may be declared a vexatious litigant. (mrgo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 JUDGMENT by Judge George H. Wu, Related to: Order #17 . Pursuant to the Order Dismissing Action for Lack of Jurisdiction, IT IS ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Presented By Order issued by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim Re Complaint #1 forwarded to the District Judge George Wu for review. (clee)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF'S POSTPONEMENT REQUEST OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Sylvia Parker. (mrgo)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Notice of Appearance #15 served on October 1, 2019. (McClendon, Regina)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Regina J McClendon on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (McClendon, Regina)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-07078 GW (SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07814 GW (SKx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim (esa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-07078-GW(SKx); 2:19-cv-07351-GW(SKx) (Feng, Simon)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., identifying Plaintiff Sylvia Parker, and Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp. (Feng, Simon)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case ; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon M. Feng, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Simon M Feng added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Feng, Simon)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-7814 GW (KSx). (esa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (hr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sylvia Parker. (ghap)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO REQUEST Paying Filing Fee in Installments, filed by plaintiff Sylvia Parker. (ghap)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Sylvia Parker. (ghap)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. Case assigned to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Stevenson. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Sylvia Parker. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sylvia Parker v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Simon M Feng
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?