G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Monica Martinez
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Monica Martinez
Case Number: 2:2019cv07815
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT RE: REFERRAL OF ACTION TO THE HONORABLE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE CHOOLJIAN filed by Plaintiff G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO CONFER AND TO FILE JOINT REPORT OR STIPULATION REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Counsel are directed forthwith to confer regarding a proposed schedule for discovery and a settlement conference and to file a Joint Report relating to the same (or, if they agree, a proposed Stipulation for the Court's consideration) by not later than November 15, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL NECESSARY DISCOVERY AND SETTLEMENTCONFERENCE by Judge William D. Keller: The Court has reviewed the complaint and answer and refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all necessary discovery proceedings and for settlement conferences. Plaintiff shall notify Magistrate Judge Chooljian immediately of the Court's referral and file a status report with this Court confirming the same. The settlement conference must occur no later than sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. At the conclusion of the settlement conference, Plaintiff shall file another statusreport within seven (7) days notifying the Court of the outcome. If the parties fail to reach a settlement, the parties are ordered to submit stipulation and proposed scheduling order for further proceedings no later than seven (7) days after the conference is completed. (shb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Clerical Error (G-11), #11 . The field of the filed date and document number was left blank on the document. The correct Notice of Clerical Error for document 11 is attached hereto. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Clerical Error re Docket 10) (shb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Default entered erroneously as defendant has filed an answer and notice of interested parties on October 30, 2019. Default will be withdrawn. (shb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 WITHDRAWN - SEE NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR #11 AND #12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Monica Martinez individually and doing business as El Nuevo Mariscos Tampico (shb) Modified on 10/31/2019 (shb).
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Monica Martinez, (shb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Monica Martinez.(shb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default Monica Martinez G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support) (Riley, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, upon Defendant Monica Martinez served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Monica Martinez. (car)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 19-03, all related G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC cases have been assigned to Judge William D. Keller for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The Related Group Control Number is CV 10-00128-WDK(JCx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (car) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge William D. Keller and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Riley, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24409660 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G and G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Monica Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?