Margaretha Natalia Widjaja v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Margaretha Natalia Widjaja
Defendant: Discover Bank, Barclays Bank Delaware, First Bank & Trust, Old Navy (ITM) Inc., Walmart Inc., Citibank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Best Buy Co., Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07825
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 44 Third STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Barclays Bank Delaware answer now due 12/6/2019; MUFG Union Bank, N.A. answer now due 12/6/2019; Old Navy ITM Inc. answer now due 12/6/2019; Walmart Inc. answer now due 12/6/2019, filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Astourian, Paro)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The hearing on Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order for Inadvertently Produced Document #23 and Plaintiff's MOTION for Protective Order for Protection From Disclosure of Private Documents Produced by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. #29 is vacated and the motions are submitted. (ib)
November 5, 2019 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Protection From Disclosure of Private Documents Produced by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. #29 Supplemental Memorandum of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Re Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 41 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Protection From Disclosure of Private Documents Produced by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. #29 filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paro Astourian)(Astourian, Paro)
November 4, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjajato MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #37 Response of Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja to Opposition of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Documents Under Seal for In Camera Review (Astourian, Paro)
October 30, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #37 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum (Corrected) in Opposition to Application for Leave to File Document Under Seal for In Camera Review)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review #24 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin L. Bohmholdt, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Karin L. Bohmholdtg, #3 Declaration of Shellee Lindstedt, #4 Exhibit to Declaration of Shellee Lindstedt, #5 Declaration of Desiree Allen-Maye)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 29, 2019 Filing 36 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Inadvertently Produced Document #23 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karin L. Bohmholdt)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Production of Personal Information In Support of its Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. (Astourian, Paro)
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. (Astourian, Paro)
October 18, 2019 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #32 filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #28 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s deadline to file its response to the First Amended Complaint herein is extended from October 17, 2019 to and including October 21, 2019. (iv)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #26 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended from October 17, 2019, to and including November 14, 2019. (iv)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Protection From Disclosure of Private Documents Produced by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paro Astourian In Support of Motion for Protective Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of James R. Galliver In Support of Motion for Protective Order, #3 Declaration Declaration of Margaretha Widjaja In Support of Motion for Protective Order, #4 Declaration Declaration of Karin L. Bohmholdt In Opposition to Motion for Protective Order, #5 Declaration Declaration of Shellee E. Lindstedt In Opposition to Motion for Protective Order, #6 Declaration Declaration of Desiree Allen-Maye In Opposition to Motion for Protective Order, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Astourian, Paro)
October 16, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer now due 10/21/2019, re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation and Joint Request to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. correcting MOTION for Protective Order for Inadvertently Produced Document #23 (Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 26 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Barclays Bank Delaware answer now due 11/14/2019; Discover Bank answer now due 11/14/2019; MUFG Union Bank, N.A. answer now due 11/14/2019; Old Navy ITM Inc. answer now due 11/14/2019; Walmart Inc. answer now due 11/14/2019, filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Astourian, Paro)
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Blakeley S Oranburg counsel for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank. (Attorney Blakeley S Oranburg added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Oranburg, Blakeley)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paro Astourian, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Astourian, Paro)
October 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order for Inadvertently Produced Document filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Joint Statement Re Discovery Dispute, #2 Declaration Karin L. Bohmholdt, #3 Declaration Shellee E. Lindstedt, #4 Declaration Desiree Allen-Maye, #5 Declaration Paro Astourian, #6 Proposed Order)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT WALMART INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #21 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendant Walmart Inc. shall have up to and through October 31, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. (iv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2019 re Amended Complaint, filed by defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation Extending Time for Walmart Inc. to Respond to the First Amended Complaint)(Foshee, Alyce)
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Timothy Peter Johnson counsel for Defendant First Bank and Trust. Adding Timothy P. Johnson as counsel of record for First Bank & Trust for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant First Bank & Trust. (Johnson, Timothy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant First Bank and Trust identifying Fishback Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Johnson, Timothy)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alyce Winn Foshee counsel for Defendant Walmart Inc.. Adding Alyce W. Foshee as counsel of record for Walmart Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attorney Alyce Winn Foshee added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Foshee, Alyce)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Deleyla Assefa Lawrence counsel for Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Adding Deleyla A. Lawrence as counsel of record for Bank of America, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attorney Deleyla Assefa Lawrence added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(Lawrence, Deleyla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Raymond Yoon Ho Kim counsel for Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware. Adding Raymond Y. Kim as counsel of record for Barclays Bank Delaware for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Barclays Bank Delaware. (Attorney Raymond Yoon Ho Kim added to party Barclays Bank Delaware(pty:dft))(Kim, Raymond)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Old Navy ITM Inc., identifying OLD NAVY, LLC (erroneously sued as OLD NAVY (ITM) INC.). (Suehiro, Megan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tod V Beebe counsel for Defendant MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. Adding Tod V. Beebe as counsel of record for MUFG Union Bank, N.A. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant MUFG Union Bank, N.A.. (Attorney Tod V Beebe added to party MUFG Union Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Beebe, Tod)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATIONS TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #6 , #7 AND #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Best Buy Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., Old Navy (ITM) Inc., MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Discover Bank, Citibank, N.A., and First Bank & Trust, shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before October 17, 2019. (iv)
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Discover Bank, identifying Discover Bank is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Discover Financial Services (DFS). DFS is a publicly traded company. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of DFS stock. (Rao, Arjun)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendant Old Navy ITM Inc.. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for OLD NAVY, LLC (erroneously sued as OLD NAVY (ITM) Inc.) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant OLD NAVY, LLC (erroneously sued as OLD NAVY (ITM) Inc.). (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Old Navy ITM Inc.(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Megan A Suehiro counsel for Defendant Old Navy ITM Inc.. Adding Megan A. Suehiro as counsel of record for OLD NAVY, LLC (erroneously sued as OLD NAVY (ITM) Inc.) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant OLD NAVY, LLC (erroneously sued as OLD NAVY (ITM) Inc.). (Attorney Megan A Suehiro added to party Old Navy ITM Inc.(pty:dft))(Suehiro, Megan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Barclays Bank Delaware answer now due 10/17/2019; Best Buy Co., Inc. answer now due 10/17/2019; Citibank, N.A. answer now due 10/17/2019; First Bank and Trust answer now due 10/17/2019; MUFG Union Bank, N.A. answer now due 10/17/2019; Old Navy ITM Inc. answer now due 10/17/2019; Walmart Inc. answer now due 10/17/2019, re Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Astourian, Paro)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Shahrzad Guerami counsel for Defendant Discover Bank. Adding Sheri Guerami as counsel of record for Discover Bank for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Discover Bank. (Attorney Shahrzad Guerami added to party Discover Bank(pty:dft))(Guerami, Shahrzad)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint, filed by defendant Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Arjun P Rao added to party Discover Bank(pty:dft))(Rao, Arjun)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Raymond Y. Kim, Counsel for Defendant. Filed in State Court on 7/9/19 Submitted with pg. 40 Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 9/12/2019 (car).
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant First Bank and Trust served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon President Manager Authorized to Receive Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/18/2019 Submitted with pg. 28 Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO FIRST Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Best Buy Co., Inc., Citibank, N.A. Submitted with pg. 397 Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 .(Attorney Marcos Daniel Sasso added to party Best Buy Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Marcos Daniel Sasso added to party Citibank, N.A.(pty:dft))(car)
September 10, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant First Bank and Trust. Submitted with pg. 389 Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER TO FIRST Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. Submitted with pg. 381 Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 .(car)
September 10, 2019 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant First Bank and Trust. Submitted with pg. 108 attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Timothy Peter Johnson added to party First Bank and Trust(pty:dft))(car)
September 10, 2019 NON-CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. Submitted with pg. 66 Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Ethan Schatz added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft))(car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant MUFG Union Bank, N.A. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Alen Kazanyan - Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/18/19 Submitted with pg. 30 attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant Citibank, N.A. served on 6/11/2019, answer due 7/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gregory J Mills Personal Banker in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/18/2019 Submitted with pg 26 attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon President Manager Authorized to Receive Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Filed in State Court on 6/18/19 Submitted with pg. 24 attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant Old Navy ITM Inc. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte - Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/11/19 Submitted with pg. 20 attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant Discover Bank served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte - Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/11/2019 Submitted with pg. 18 attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte - Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/11/19 Submitted with pg. 14 attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja, upon Defendant Bank of America, N.A. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte - Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 6/11/19 Submitted with pg. 12 attachment 3 to notice of removal #1 (car) Modified on 9/11/2019 (car).
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Best Buy Co., Inc., Citibank, N.A., Discover Bank, Does 1 through 50, inclusive, First Bank and Trust, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Old Navy ITM Inc., Walmart Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. Filed in State Court on 8/29/19 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank Delaware, Best Buy Co., Inc., Citibank, N.A., Discover Bank, Does 1 through 50 inclusive, First Bank and Trust, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., MUFG Union Bank, N.A., Old Navy ITM Inc., Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Margaretha Natalia Widjaja. Filed in State Court on 6/4/19 Submitted with attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., (Bohmholdt, Karin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV19443 Receipt No: 0973-24413021 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3: Other State Court File Materials) (Attorney Karin Bohmholdt added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Bohmholdt, Karin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margaretha Natalia Widjaja v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy (ITM) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Karin Bohmholdt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Union Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaretha Natalia Widjaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?