Whitaker v. Illusion Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Illusion Holdings, LLC, BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc., and Ocean Blue Investments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv07842
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE (In Chambers): Order DECLINING to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state law claim by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: For the foregoing reasons, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claim. The Court therefore DISMISSES that claim without prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, #17 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Handy, Russell)
October 24, 2019 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #14 as to Defendant Ocean Blue Investments, LLC. (bm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Seabock, Christopher)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order to Show Cause re: Supplemental Jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The complaint filed in this action asserts a claim for injunctive relief arising out of an alleged violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA") and a claim for damages pursuant to California's Unruh Civil Rights Act. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than November 5, 2019 why it should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim. (bm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc., answer now due 11/22/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc.,.(Marker, Caleb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Ocean Blue Investments, LLC served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: ANDREW PHAM in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker(Montgomery, Elliott)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc., served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon BRUCE JOSEPH TEICHMAN in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Caleb Marker on behalf of Defendant BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc., (Attorney Caleb Marker added to party BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc.,(pty:dft))(Marker, Caleb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Illusion Holdings, LLC served on 9/21/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon FRED F MASHIAN in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc.,, Illusion Holdings, LLC, and Ocean Blue Investments, LLC. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24415017 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Illusion Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illusion Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BT Lewis Enterprises, Inc.,
Represented By: Caleb Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Blue Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Elliott Charles Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?