Rafael Arroyo, Jr. v. Thrifty Payless, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Arroyo, Jr.
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Thrifty Payless, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07843
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 12/2/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc., identifying Rite Aid Corporation. (Arnold, Wayne)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc..(Attorney Wayne C Arnold added to party Thrifty Payless, Inc.(pty:dft))(Arnold, Wayne)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Show Cause Response due by 10/22/2019. (twdb)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr., re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 9/30/2019. (Handy, Russell)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr., upon Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriella Sanchez in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-7843 SVW(PLAx). (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc. (ghap)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr., (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Handy, Russell)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24415123 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Rafael Arroyo, Jr.. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Rafael Arroyo, Jr.(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafael Arroyo, Jr. v. Thrifty Payless, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne C Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Arroyo, Jr.
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?