United States of America v. 2,640 Cases of Imported Bottled Alcohol et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, and United States of America
Defendant: 2,640 CASES OF IMPORTED BOTTLED ALCOHOL LABELED PINEAPPLE FRUIT WINE AND 1,320 CASES OF IMPORTED BOTTLED ALCOHOL LABELED PEACH FRUIT WINE
Claimant: OB USA, INC. dba BWS Group Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv07851
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Claimant OB USA, INC. dba BWS Group Co..(Attorney Pio S Kim added to party OB USA, INC. dba BWS Group Co.(pty:clm))(Kim, Pio)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 Amended Claim of Interest by Claimant OB USA, Inc. dba BWS GROUP CO. filed by Claimant OB USA, INC. dba BWS Group Co. (Kim, Pio)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 Claim of Interest by Claimant OB USA, Inc. dba BWS GROUP CO. filed by Claimant OB USA, INC. dba BWS Group Co. (Su, Alexander)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication upon Defendant Publication was made in the official government website: www.forfeiture.gov for 30 consecutive days. (Galatzan, Jonathan)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Appointing United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Customs and Border Protection a Substitute Custodian in Place of the U.S. Marshal Service #7 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-04981 RGK (PLAx). Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07851 RGK (PLAx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (esa)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT for seizure of 2,640 Cases of Imported Bottled Alcohol Labeled Pineapple Fruit Wine and approximately 1,320 Cases of Imported Bottled Alcohol Labeled Peach Fruit Wine issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (jtil)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY - U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION in place of U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Galatzan, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-04981-RGK (PLAx) (Galatzan, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum by U.S. Attorney re: Magistrate Judge Assignment filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (Galatzan, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 09/11/2019, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Galatzan, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Galatzan, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Galatzan, Jonathan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attorney Jonathan Galatzan added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Galatzan, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2,640 Cases of Imported Bottled Alcohol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,
Represented By: Jonathan Galatzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Galatzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2,640 CASES OF IMPORTED BOTTLED ALCOHOL LABELED PINEAPPLE FRUIT WINE AND 1,320 CASES OF IMPORTED BOTTLED ALCOHOL LABELED PEACH FRUIT WINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: OB USA, INC. dba BWS Group Co.
Represented By: Alexander Su
Represented By: Pio S Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?