Chen Qiu v. Marcus Pollard
Petitioner: Chen Qiu
Respondent: Marcus Pollard
Case Number: 2:2019cv07853
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Herbert S. Tetef on behalf of Respondent Marcus Pollard. (Attorney Herbert S Tetef added to party Marcus Pollard(pty:res))(Tetef, Herbert)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Within 14 days of the date of this Order, Respondent shall serve and file a Notice of Appearance notifying the court of the name of the attorney who will have principal charge of the case, together with the address where the attorney may be served, and the attorneys telephone and fax number. Respondent Marcus Pollard file Answer to the Petition not later than 1/6/2020. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 12/23/2019. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (See Order for Further Details) (Attachments: #1 Petition) (kl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Chen Qiu. The Petitioner does not consent. (ghap)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Chen Qiu. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 2254, #2 Part 2 2254) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen Qiu v. Marcus Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marcus Pollard
Represented By: Herbert S Tetef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chen Qiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?