Mauricio Gonzalez v. East Los Angeles Sheriffs
Plaintiff: Mauricio Gonzalez
Defendant: East Los Angeles Sheriffs
Case Number: 2:2019cv07867
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
2 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOCKET NO. #9 ) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Plaintiff's deadline to comply with the October 7 Order is extended to November 27, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Mauricio Gonzalez. (sbou)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty 20 days of the date of this Order. (See document for further details.) (Attachments: #1 CV66 Form Civil Rights Complaint, #2 CV9 Notice of Dismissal) (et)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER RE: PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Until the Complaint has been screened and the Court has ordered that service of process may occur, plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendants. (See document for details.) (sbou)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting #5 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. ; granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (sbou)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Mauricio Gonzalez. (sbou)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-07867 SVW (JC). (esa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Mauricio Gonzalez. (esa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants East Los Angeles Sheriffs pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, filed by plaintiff Mauricio Gonzalez. (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauricio Gonzalez v. East Los Angeles Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Los Angeles Sheriffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?