Lili Chin v. Seven Islands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lili Chin
Defendant: Seven Islands, Inc. and E.E. Schenck Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv07870
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Dismissal) (mrgo)
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Lili Chin. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Green, Susan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant E.E. Schenck Company, (Woods, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to E.E. Schenck Company answer now due 11/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant E.E. Schenck Company.(Attorney Thomas A Woods added to party E.E. Schenck Company(pty:dft))(Woods, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lili Chin, upon Defendant Seven Islands, Inc. served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hiro Mehuri, owner, authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Green, Susan)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Gerber APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Lili Chin, designating Susan Green as local counsel. (mrgo)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-7870 PA (FFMx). (esa)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Lili Chin, upon Defendant E.E. Schenck Company served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jason Brauser, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Green, Susan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Gerber to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Lili Chin (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/18/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24458271) filed by plaintiff Lili Chin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Green, Susan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lili Chin. (Green, Susan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Andrew Gerber. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant E.E. Schenck Company, Seven Islands, Inc. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (lh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lili Chin. (Green, Susan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lili Chin. (Green, Susan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lili Chin, (Green, Susan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24420801 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lili Chin. (Attorney Susan Hope Green added to party Lili Chin(pty:pla))(Green, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lili Chin v. Seven Islands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lili Chin
Represented By: Susan Hope Green
Represented By: Andrew Gerber
Represented By: Robert A Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Islands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.E. Schenck Company
Represented By: Thomas A Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?