Jerry Minton et al v. Earth Touch USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stuart Ablaza and Jerry Minton
Defendant: Paco Mendoza, Earth Touch USA, LLC and DOES 1 through and including Doe 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv07881
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On October 2, 2018, this Court issued its Minute Order granting Defendants Unopposed Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. No. 9). Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court orders that such judgment be entered. (bm)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. NO. 9) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case: Accordingly, the Court deems Plaintiff's failure to file an opposition as consent to the granting of Defendant's Motion. The Court therefore GRANTS the Motion and DISMISSES the complaint without prejudice. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (bm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Earth Touch USA, LLC, Paco Mendoza. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Lee, Suzy)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-7881 VAP (KSx). (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 CONFORMED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Stuart Ablaza and Jerry Minton in Los Angeles Superior Court on 6/6/2019, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Stuart Ablaza and Jerry Minton in Los Angels Superior Court on 3/29/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Earth Touch USA, LLC, Paco Mendoza. (Lee, Suzy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Earth Touch USA, LLC (Lee, Suzy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Earth Touch USA, LLC, Paco Mendoza, identifying (1) Plaintiff Jerry Minton; (2) Plaintiff Stuart Ablaza; (3) Defendant EarthTouch USA, LLC; and (4) Defendant Francisco Mendoza. (Lee, Suzy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV10895 Receipt No: 0973-24422846 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Paco Mendoza, Earth Touch USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paco Mendoza, #2 Declaration of Lara Cox, #3 Declaration of Suzy Lee, #4 Exhibit A to Decl. of Suzy Lee, #5 Exhibit B to Decl. of Suzy Lee, #6 Exhibit C to Decl.of Suzy Lee, #7 Exhibit D to Decl. of Suzy Lee, #8 Exhibit E to Decl. of Suzy Lee, #9 Exhibit F to Decl. of Suzy Lee) (Attorney Suzy E Lee added to party Earth Touch USA, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Suzy E Lee added to party Paco Mendoza(pty:dft))(Lee, Suzy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry Minton et al v. Earth Touch USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Ablaza
Represented By: David Covington Garrett
Represented By: Lin Zhan
Represented By: Dale Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Minton
Represented By: David Covington Garrett
Represented By: Lin Zhan
Represented By: Dale Alan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paco Mendoza
Represented By: Suzy E Lee
Represented By: Nathan Vern Okelberry
Represented By: Todd B Scherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earth Touch USA, LLC
Represented By: Suzy E Lee
Represented By: Nathan Vern Okelberry
Represented By: Todd B Scherwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through and including Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?