Brian Whitaker v. Bruce A. Meyer et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Khindra Enterprises, Inc.,, Does 1- 10, Bruce A. Meyer and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv07886
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (ake)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Khindra Enterprises, Inc., served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sergio Cruz in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Bruce A. Meyer(in individual capacity) served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019; Bruce A. Meyer(in representative capacity as trustee of the Meyer Living Trust, dated June 23, 1997) served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of address by Russell C Handy attorney for Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Changing attorneys address to 8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200, San Diego, CA 92111. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (ake)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Khindra Enterprises, Inc.,, Bruce A. Meyer(in individual capacity), Bruce A. Meyer(in representative capacity as trustee of the Meyer Living Trust, dated June 23, 1997). (car)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24423206 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Bruce A. Meyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khindra Enterprises, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1- 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?