Financial Pacific Insurance Company v. United States Fire Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv07938
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 #27 filed by Counter Claimant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attorney Scott P Ward added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:cc))(Ward, Scott)
March 2, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott P Ward on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Attorney Scott P Ward added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Ward, Scott)
February 24, 2020 Filing 28 FINANCIAL PACIFIC INSURANCE COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO UNITED STATES FIRE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 #27 filed by Plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Blau, David)
January 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Answer to Counterclaim, #12 filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael W. Goodin in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim, #3 Redacted Document Redacted Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company with Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief and Equitable Subrogation, #4 Unredacted Document Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company with Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief and Equitable Subrogation, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company's Answer and Counterclaim) (Goodin, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Final Pretrial Conference: August 17, 2020 at 2:30 p.m., Jury Trial Date: September 1, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant(s). UNLESS OTHERWISE ORDERED BY THE COURT, THE FOLLOWING RULES SHALL APPLY: (see document for further details) (bm)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing on December 16, 2019 is VACATED, and the following dates are hereby set. Please review the Court's trial order for further details. Last Day to Add Parties and Amend Pleadings (Doe defendants are dismissed as of cut-off to add parties): January 16, 2020; Discovery Cut-Off: May 26, 2020; Last Day to File Motion: June 9, 2020; Opening Expert Witness Disclosure [See F.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2)]; June 2, 2020; Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure: June 30, 2020; Expert Discovery Cut-Off: July 21, 2020; Final Pretrial Conference (2:30 p.m.): August 17, 2020; Jury Trial (9:00 a.m.): September 1, 2020, Estimated Length: 4 Days. (bm)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than July 2, 2020. (bm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (Blau, David)
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company, identifying United Fire Group, Inc. and United Fire & Casualty Company. (Nelson, Ron)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Answer to Counterclaim, #12 filed by Counter Defendant Financial Pacific Insurance Company.(Nelson, Ron)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the documents listed below were improperly filed for the following reasons: Duplicate filings. The following document(s) shall be stricken from the record and shall not be considered by the Court: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company #15 #14 . (yl)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Kristin Gallagher APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Insurance Company, designating Michael W Goodin as local counsel. (bm)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 **STRICKEN**ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Pickett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company, designating Michael W Goodin as local counsel. (bm) Modified on 10/1/2019 (yl).
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE:, APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Pickett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24475358) #14 ; APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/20/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24475219) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): No signature by local counsel for document no. 14. (lom)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2019 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/20/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24475219) filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goodin, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Pickett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24475358) filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goodin, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24475219) filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goodin, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #10 , COUNTERCLAIM against United States Fire Insurance Company filed by Defendant/Counterclaimant United States Fire Insurance Company.(Goodin, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer, Counterclaim #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Caption of attached document should also include a separate, additional counterclaim caption. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) , COUNTERCLAIM against Financial Pacific Insurance Company filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company.(Goodin, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on September 17, 2019. (Goodin, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel Pickett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Interested Parties and Notice of Related Cases are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. Amendment to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Amended Certificate of Service (Goodin, Michael)
September 12, 2019 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, United States Fire Insurance Company, filed by plaintiff Financial Pacific Insurance Company. (filed in stated court 7/31/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV26859 Receipt No: 0973-24431012 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Notice of No Related Cases) (Attorney Michael W Goodin added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Goodin, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Financial Pacific Insurance Company v. United States Fire Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael W Goodin
Represented By: Daniel Pickett
Represented By: Kristin V Gallagher
Represented By: Scott P Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Represented By: David S Blau
Represented By: Ron L Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?