Sandra Mary Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sandra Mary Wilson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv07948
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV19-7948 AS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Sandra Mary Wilson. (Lambert, Meghan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sandra Mary Wilson, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General's Office. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lambert, Meghan)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Attorney Jennifer A Kenney added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Kenney, Jennifer)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certification & Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Sandra Mary Wilson, identifying None. (Lambert, Meghan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Sandra Mary Wilson. (Lambert, Meghan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Sandra Mary Wilson. (Lambert, Meghan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24431688 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Sandra Mary Wilson. (Attorney Meghan O Lambert added to party Sandra Mary Wilson(pty:pla))(Lambert, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandra Mary Wilson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer A Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Mary Wilson
Represented By: Meghan O Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?