Alan Baker et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Alan Baker and Linda B Oliver
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Edward Carrasco and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv08024
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 The hearing on the MOTION TO DISMISS #11 #9 , scheduled for November 18, 2019 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Edward Carrasco #9 filed by Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Edward Carrasco. (Attorney Marc J Feldman added to party Edward Carrasco(pty:dft))(Feldman, Marc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alan Baker, Linda B Oliver, (Hook, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss in opposition to motion to dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action #11 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Edward Carrasco #9 filed by Plaintiffs Alan Baker, Linda B Oliver. (Hook, Christopher)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, identifying Edward Carrasco. (Burns, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ISO Allstate's Motion to Dismiss Causes of Action, #2 Proposed Order) (Burns, John)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Edward Carrasco #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Edward Carrasco filed by Defendant Edward Carrasco. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Edward Carrasco's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney John F Burns added to party Edward Carrasco(pty:dft)) (Burns, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on 09/20/19. (Burns, John)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
September 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Baker, Linda B Oliver, upon Defendant Edward Carrasco served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 10053 Greenwood Ave., Montclair, CA 91763 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/26/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C) (ghap)
September 17, 2019 (CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alan Baker, Linda B Oliver, upon Defendant Allstate Insurance Company served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist at CT Corporation System, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/26/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B) (ghap) Modified on 9/19/2019 (ghap).
September 17, 2019 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Allstate Insurance Company, Edward Carrasco, Does 1 through 10, inclusive., filed by plaintiffs Alan Baker, Linda B Oliver. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 09/17/19. (Burns, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company, identifying The Allstate Corporation, Allstate Insurance Company, Alan Baker, Linda B. Oliver. (Burns, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Burns, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV28664 Receipt No: 0973-24449564 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B -Service on Allstate, #3 Exhibit C - Service on Carrasco, #4 Exhibit D - Documents filed with LASC) (Attorney John F Burns added to party Allstate Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Burns, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alan Baker et al v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: John F Burns
Represented By: Peter H Klee
Represented By: Marc J Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Carrasco
Represented By: John F Burns
Represented By: Marc J Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Baker
Represented By: Christopher G Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda B Oliver
Represented By: Christopher G Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?